Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew T Schelp
Case #: 4:24-cv-01664
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 4:31 AM CST
Defendant
Robert Honz
1791 Primrose Lane
Barnhart, MO 63012
Represented By
James G. Nowogrocki
Summers Compton LLC
contact info
Brian J. LaFlamme
Summers Compton LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jordan Parnass Digital Architecture, LLC
Defendant
Jeffrey Stientjes
13807 Amiot Drive Apt D
Saint Louis, MO 63146
Represented By
James G. Nowogrocki
Summers Compton LLC
contact info
Brian J. LaFlamme
Summers Compton LLC
contact info
Defendant
Valley Capital LLC
Represented By
James G. Nowogrocki
Summers Compton LLC
contact info
Brian J. LaFlamme
Summers Compton LLC
contact info
Defendant
Blue Mavi, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Grilliot
Boggs Avellino LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Arteaga Photos, Ltd.
10851 Mastin St Ste 900
Overland Park, KS 66210
Represented By
Steven H. Mustoe
Evans And Dixon Llc - Overland Park
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
34 34 notice Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency (Teams & Cape) Mon 04/21 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re33 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Defendant Jordan Parnass Digital Architecture, LLC. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: The attorney's signature on the signature block must match the name of the e-filer. This is an informational notice and no further action is needed at this time. All future filings must be in compliance with this rule. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/18 1:13 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re28 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Jordan Parnass Digital Architecture, LLC. (Meriage, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
32 32 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/08 1:28 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re28 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Arteaga Photos, Ltd.. (Mustoe, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
31 31 order A Docket Text Order Fri 03/14 2:02 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's consent Motion for Extension of Time, Doc.30 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant Jordan Parnass Digital Architecture, LLC's Motion to Dismiss no later than April 08, 2025. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 03/14/2025. (KCD)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/14 11:54 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 Memorandum in Support of Motion,28 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Arteaga Photos, Ltd.. (Mustoe, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
29 29 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 03/10 1:15 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re28 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Jordan Parnass Digital Architecture, LLC.(Meriage, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
28 28 motion Dismiss Case Mon 03/10 1:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Jordan Parnass Digital Architecture, LLC. (Meriage, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
27 27 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 02/11 5:44 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blue Mavi, Inc... (Grilliot, Mark)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 02/11 4:49 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jordan Parnass Digital Architecture, LLC. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Zygmund, Zachary)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Tue 02/11 11:01 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant Jordan Parnass Digital Architecture, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (TMT)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Tue 02/11 11:01 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant Blue Mavi, Inc. - SECOND NOTICE. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (TMT)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/10 5:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Blue Mavi, Inc..(Grilliot, Mark)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Jury Demand Mon 02/10 5:50 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Blue Mavi, Inc.. (Grilliot, Mark)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 02/10 12:52 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jordan Parnass Digital Architecture, LLC Jordan Parnass Digital Architecture, LLC waiver signed on 2/7/2025, answer due 4/8/2025. (Zygmund, Zachary)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 02/10 12:43 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Zachary Kurtz Zygmund for Defendant Jordan Parnass Digital Architecture, LLC. (Zygmund, Zachary)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 02/10 12:41 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Meriage for Defendant Jordan Parnass Digital Architecture, LLC. (Meriage, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
18 18 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Thu 02/06 3:01 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robert Honz, Jeffrey Stientjes, Valley Capital LLC. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Nowogrocki, James)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/06 2:59 PM
Defendants Robert Honz, Jeffrey Stientjes and Valley Capital LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Robert Honz, Jeffrey Stientjes, Valley Capital LLC.(Nowogrocki, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
16 16 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Tue 01/28 2:42 PM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendants Valley Capital LLC, Blue Mavi, Inc. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (TMT)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
15 15 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Mon 01/13 12:22 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, Doc.13 , is GRANTED. Defendant Blue Mavi, Inc. shall file its required response to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than February 10, 2025. (Blue Mavi, Inc. answer due 2/10/2025.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 1/13/2025. (TMT)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 01/13 12:22 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 15. Mon Jan 13 12:22:48 CST 2025 (Tillman, Tiffani)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
14 14 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 01/10 5:30 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Mark Grilliot for Defendant Blue Mavi, Inc.. (Grilliot, Mark)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/10 5:27 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Blue Mavi, Inc.. (Grilliot, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
12 12 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Mon 01/06 12:07 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Honz, Stientjes, and Valley Capial LLC's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, Doc.9 , is GRANTED. Defendants Honz, Stientjes, and Valley Capital LLC shall file their required response to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than February 06, 2025. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 1/6/2025. (BRP)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Mon 01/06 8:03 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant Valley Capital LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (TMT)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
10 10 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 01/03 4:22 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Brian J. LaFlamme for Defendants Robert Honz, Jeffrey Stientjes, Valley Capital LLC. (LaFlamme, Brian)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/03 4:20 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Robert Honz, Jeffrey Stientjes, Valley Capital LLC. (Nowogrocki, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 01/03 4:19 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by James G. Nowogrocki for Defendants Robert Honz, Jeffrey Stientjes, Valley Capital LLC. (Nowogrocki, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
7 7 order A Docket Text Order Fri 12/20 1:49 PM
Docket Text ORDER Re:3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven H. Mustoe by Plaintiff Arteaga Photos, Ltd.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/20/2024. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 12/17 1:54 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arteaga Photos, Ltd.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Mustoe, Steven)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Tue 12/17 10:58 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Arteaga Photos, Ltd.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (TMT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
4 4 misc Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright Tue 12/10 8:52 AM
REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (JWD)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Notification Tue 12/10 3:43 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. 5 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Steven H. Mustoe. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/09 4:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven H. Mustoe. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10979160) by Plaintiff Arteaga Photos, Ltd..(Mustoe, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Mon 12/09 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Arteaga Photos, Ltd. (Mustoe, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/09 4:45 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number BMOEDC-10978991, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Arteaga Photos, Ltd..(Mustoe, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form,
Att: 4 Summons Summons Def. Honz,
Att: 5 Summons Summons Def. Stientjes,
Att: 6 Summons Summons Def. Jordan Parnass Digital Architecture,
Att: 7 Summons Summons Def. Blue Mavi