Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:William M Conley
Referred: Anita Marie Boor
Case #: 3:24-cv-00872
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 4:12 AM CST
Defendant
Ashland County
Defendant
Dan Grady
Defendant
Brian Zupke
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Lavasseur
Represented By
Ben Hitchcock Cross
Cross Law Firm, S.C.
contact info
William Wetzel
Cross Law Firm, S.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
12 12 order Pretrial Conference Order Tue 04/08 3:58 PM
Pretrial Conference Order -[LINK:Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley] attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 5/27/2025. Dispositive Motions due 3/2/2026. Settlement Letters due 7/3/2026. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 7/10/2026. Responses due 7/24/2026. First Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2026 at 02:30 PM. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2026 at 02:30 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/17/2026 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 4/8/2025. (lam)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference Tue 04/08 4:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/8/2025 [00:16] (ckl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 04/02 2:14 PM
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Sauer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
10 10 misc Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report Tue 04/01 2:20 PM
Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Lavasseur (Hitchcock Cross, Ben)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
utility Set Pretrial or Status Conference Tue 03/11 9:55 AM
Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2025 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Please call (669) 254-5252 and enter meeting ID 161 2455 6623 when prompted. Wait to be admitted into the conference. The parties are advised that a Rule 26(f) conference shall occur not less than two weeks before the preliminary pretrial conference, and that the parties' report or reports must be filed not less than one week before the preliminary pretrial conference.[[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] [[LINK:Procedures for Requesting a Hearing to Resolve a Deposition Dispute] attached] (lam)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 1:00 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Mark Andrew Sauer for Defendants Ashland County, Dan Grady, Brian Zupke. (Sauer, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/10 12:59 PM
ANSWER by Defendants Ashland County, Dan Grady, Brian Zupke. (Sauer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/24 1:19 PM
Summons Returned Executed. Ashland County served on 2/21/2025, answer due 3/14/2025; Dan Grady served on 2/21/2025, answer due 3/14/2025; Brian Zupke served on 2/19/2025, answer due 3/12/2025. (lak)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service Mon 02/24 1:12 PM
Disregard. Modified on 2/24/2025. (lak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 02/11 3:33 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lak)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/11 1:24 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Lavasseur. (Hitchcock Cross, Ben) Modified on 2/11/2025. (lak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Summons,
Att: 2 Request for Summons
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
misc Action Requested Wed 02/05 9:13 AM
Action Requested: Plaintiff is requested to promptly file proof of service of the complaint. (lam)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
3 3 misc Exhibit Fri 01/31 10:39 AM
Exhibit to1 Complaint filed by Kimberly J. Lavasseur (Hitchcock Cross, Ben)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/08 1:22 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ben Hitchcock Cross for Plaintiff Kimberly J. Lavasseur. (Hitchcock Cross, Ben)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
utility Add Judge for Shell Case Opening Tue 12/10 7:47 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor. (lak)
Related: [-]
utility Standard Attachments Sent Tue 12/10 7:47 AM
Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (lak)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/09 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AWIWDC-3532399.), filed by Kimberly J Lavasseur. (Wetzel, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet