Utah District Court
Judge:Dustin B Pead
Case #: 1:24-cv-00201
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 3:12 AM MST
Defendant
Smith's Layton Distribution
Plaintiff
Corneatia S Hill
850 E 1400 S APT C302
CLEARFIELD, UT 84015

GPO Jan 30 2025
RULING AND ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT temporarily granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERING Plaintiff timely filing her Amended Complaint no later than February 20, 2025. The words Amended Complaint should appear in the caption of the document, Plaintiff is advised that her Amended Complaint will completely replace all prior versions of the complaint and any claims which are not realleged will be deemed abandoned; the Amended Complaint must provide a statement of each claim raised along with the specific facts that support the claim. Plaintiff must clearly identify all relevant parties, once filed, the court will again screen the Amended complaint under 28 U.S.C.§ 1915(e) and Local Civil Rule DUCivR 3-2(b); other than the Amended Complaint, the restriction on filing motions or other documents set forth in the courts December 10, 2024 Order remains in place. Failure to file a timely Amended Complaint may result in dismissal of Plaintiff's action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/30/2025. (haa)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/29 2:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Corneatia S Hill. Summons as to Spherion Staffing LLC. (kec)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/29 2:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Corneatia S Hill. Summons as to Smith's Layton Distribution. (kec)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
14 14 misc Remark - Service Packet Tue 04/22 3:41 PM
REMARK - The clerk's offices received summonses from the Plaintiff and has issued them for Defendants: Smith's Layton Distribution & Spherion Staffing, LLC. A service packet comprising the items on the attached cover sheet was prepared for each defendant and hand-delivered to the US Marshal's Office on 4/22/2025 for service per the order of Judge Dustin B. Pead. (kec)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 3:06 PM
Summons Issued as to Spherion Staffing LLC. (kec)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 3:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Smith's Layton Distribution. (kec)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/10 3:48 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before April 21, 2025, Ms. Hill must complete and submit to the Clerks Office a summons (AO 440) and service of process form (USM-285) for each Defendant. The Clerk of Court must issue a summons for each Defendant and provide a service packet for each Defendant to the United States Marshals Service. The United States Marshals Service must serve on each Defendant a completed summons, a copy of the amended complaint, and a copy of this order. If Ms. Hill fails to timely submit the above-referenced documents, this case may be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/10/2025. (kec)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/25 11:42 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES - Case 1:24cv202 shall be transferred to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Ms. Hill shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to object to the transfer. If a timely objection is filed, no transfer will occur until the undersigned rules on the objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/25/2025. (alf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/21 4:13 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Smith's Layton Distribution, Spherion Staffing LLC with Jury Demand. Filed by Corneatia S Hill. (haa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 3 Exhibit C Complaint Attachment
Thursday, January 30, 2025
8 8 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Memorandum Decision Thu 01/30 2:39 PM
RULING AND ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT temporarily granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERING Plaintiff timely filing her Amended Complaint no later than February 20, 2025. The words Amended Complaint should appear in the caption of the document, Plaintiff is advised that her Amended Complaint will completely replace all prior versions of the complaint and any claims which are not realleged will be deemed abandoned; the Amended Complaint must provide a statement of each claim raised along with the specific facts that support the claim. Plaintiff must clearly identify all relevant parties, once filed, the court will again screen the Amended complaint under 28 U.S.C.§ 1915(e) and Local Civil Rule DUCivR 3-2(b); other than the Amended Complaint, the restriction on filing motions or other documents set forth in the courts December 10, 2024 Order remains in place. Failure to file a timely Amended Complaint may result in dismissal of Plaintiff's action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/30/2025. (haa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
7 7 misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Fri 12/20 8:33 AM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Corneatia S Hill. (mh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 12/10 12:09 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court will screen Plaintiffs complaint under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e) and Local Civil Rule DUCivR 3-2 (b). Plaintiff may complete and return forms provided by the Court. The Clerks Office is directed to provide Plaintiff with the e-mail filing and electronic notification form for unrepresented parties. Other than Court forms, Plaintiff must not file any motions or other documents during the time the case is screened or until the Court orders otherwise. If such documents are filed, they will be lodged on the docket and will not be addressed until screening is completed. The time to serve the complaint is tolled until further order of the court. If the action is allowed to proceed, the Court will order service of process on the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/10/2024. (sg)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Tue 12/10 8:28 AM
NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Corneatia S Hill. Form due by 12/31/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
4 4 misc Exhibits Tue 12/10 8:15 AM
EXHIBIT 4 filed by Corneatia S Hill re1 Complaint. (alf)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Email Filing and Notification Form Mon 12/09 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Email Filing and Notification Form by Corneatia S Hill. (sg)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 12/09 4:58 PM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Corneatia S Hill. (sg)
Related: [-] ceived by the court on: 12/09/2024
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint (Court) Mon 12/09 4:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Smith's Layton Distribution (Originally received by the court on 12/09/2024). (Fee Status: Pending IFP) filed by Corneatia S Hill. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1B,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 Right to Sue