Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert J White
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-13251
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Terminated:Dec 10, 2024
Defendant
Hursh
Defendant
Mosley
Plaintiff
Jerry Rick Vandiver
Plaintiff
Jerry VanDiver

GPO Dec 10 2024
OPINION AND ORDER denying 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and dismissing 1 Complaint. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (DPer)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
5 5 order Judgment* Tue 12/10 4:08 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (DPer)
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs order Memorandum Opinion & Order Tue 12/10 4:07 PM
OPINION AND ORDER denying2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and dismissing1 Complaint. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (DPer)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Tue 12/10 4:10 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re4 Opinion and order and5 Judgment on Jerry VanDiver Pris. No. 141306 at Gus Harrison Correctional Facility, 2727 E. Beecher St., Adrian, MI 49221. (DPer)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
3 3 notice Mediation Program* Mon 12/09 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Mediation Program (JHea)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Mon 12/09 2:22 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Jerry VanDiver. (JHea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 12/09 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Jerry VanDiver against Hursh, Mosley (JHea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet