Missouri Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00479
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 10, 2024 2:23 AM CST
Defendant
Rosalio Melendrez-Valenzuela (1)
Represented By
Scott James Krischke
Federal Public Defender - St Louis
contact info
St. Louis Fed Public Defender
Federal Public Defender - St Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Geoffrey Stephen Ogden
United States Attorneys Office - St. Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/10/2024 2:26 AM CST
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT returned in open court on 9/11/2024 to Judge Henry Edward Autrey by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph S. Dueker as to Rosalio Melendrez-Valenzuela (1) count(s) 1. (JKL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 REDACTED INDICTMENT returned in open court on 9/11/2024 to Judge Henry Edward Autrey by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph S. Dueker as to Rosalio Melendrez-Valenzuela (1): Former count 1 is now count 1r.. (JKL)
Related: [-]
3 3 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Geoffrey Stephen Ogden appearing for USA. (JKL)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Hearing by USA as to Rosalio Melendrez-Valenzuela. (JKL)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order:...IT IS BY THE COURT ORDERED that said indictment shall be sealed and suppressed by the Clerk of the Court until said defendant is in custody or has given bail for the defendant's final appearance. Order as to Rosalio Melendrez-Valenzuela. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/11/2024. (JKL)
Related: [-]