Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tiffany M Cartwright
Case #: 3:24-cv-06003
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 2:23 AM PST
Defendant
Reagan Gold Group LLC
Plaintiff
Mark Hoffman
Represented By
Samuel J Strauss
Strauss Borrelli PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
19 19 respm Response to Motion Thu 05/01 8:58 AM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Mark Hoffman, to18 MOTION to Amend 14 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,13 MOTION to Set Aside Default ,12 MOTION to Set Aside Default ,15 Proposed Order (Unsigned), ,12 MOTION to Set Aside Default .(Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 -- Oklahoma TCPA Lawsuit
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
18 18 motion Amend Wed 04/30 10:00 AM
MOTION to Amend 14 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,13 MOTION to Set Aside Default ,12 MOTION to Set Aside Default ,15 Proposed Order (Unsigned), , filed by Defendant Reagan Gold Group LLC. Noting Date 5/21/2025 5/16/2025 , (Rose, David) Modified on 4/30/2025 (MW)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public) Wed 04/30 4:37 PM
Noting Date Set/Reset re18 MOTION to Amend 14 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,13 MOTION to Set Aside Default ,12 MOTION to Set Aside Default ,15 Proposed Order (Unsigned): Noting Date 5/21/2025. (MW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
utility Terminate Motions (Public) Tue 04/29 10:57 AM
***Motion terminated:13 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Reagan Gold Group LLC. Filing terminated due to being a declaration, not a motion.(MDH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Mon 04/28 2:09 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re12 MOTION to Set Aside Default . ***Action Required*** Improper Signature. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MDH)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
16 16 respm Response to Motion Sun 04/27 5:06 AM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Mark Hoffman, to13 MOTION to Set Aside Default ,12 MOTION to Set Aside Default .(Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 -- December 10, 2024 E-mail from Defendant,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 -- January 7, 2025 E-mail from Defendant's Attorney,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 -- January 15, 2025 E-mail from Defendant's Second Attorney
Friday, April 25, 2025
15 15 misc Proposed Order (Unsigned) Fri 04/25 3:16 PM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re12 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Rose, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/25 3:12 PM
ORDER re10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anthony Paronich for Plaintiff Mark Hoffman, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Set Aside Default Fri 04/25 3:11 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default , filed by Defendant Reagan Gold Group LLC. Noting Date 5/16/2025, (Rose, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Steve Francis
12 12 motion Set Aside Default Fri 04/25 3:08 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 5/16/2025, (Rose, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/24 1:05 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF SHOWING CAUSE & MOTION9 TO COMMENCE DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(MDH)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 11:39 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony I. Paronich FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Mark Hoffman (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8944666 (Strauss, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 05, 2025
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Sat 04/05 1:54 PM
MOTION Brief Showing Cause & Motion to Commence Discovery Prior to Rule 26(F) Conference , filed by Plaintiff Mark Hoffman. Noting Date 4/18/2025, (Strauss, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 24, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/24 4:17 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court ORDERS Mr. Hoffman to show cause as to why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute no later than April 7, 2025. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MW)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David M Rose on behalf of Defendant Reagan Gold Group LLC. (Rose, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
6 6 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 01/31 10:49 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Reagan Gold Group LLC. (MET)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
5 5 motion Default Thu 01/30 10:10 AM
MOTION for Default against REAGAN GOLD GROUP, LLC,, filed by Plaintiff Mark Hoffman. Noting Date 1/30/2025, (Strauss, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
4 4 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 12/13 6:39 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Reagan Gold Group, LLC on 12/10/2024, filed by Plaintiff Mark Hoffman. (Strauss, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
3 3 order TMC - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Tue 12/10 7:45 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/24/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/3/2025, Joint Status Report due by 3/10/2025. (MET)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 12/09 9:22 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Reagan Gold Group LLC (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to Filer Mon 12/09 9:07 AM
NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:24-cv-2003 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number. All future filings shall bear the following case number and Judge assignment: 3:24-cv-6003-TMC. Before initiating a new case, please review the[LINK:Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF)] to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (HH)
Related: [-]
Judge Tiffany M Cartwright added Unassigned added. (HH) Modified on 12/9/2024 to correctly show Judge assignment. (CDA).
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action against defendant(s) Reagan Gold Group, LLC with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Samuel J Strauss added to party Mark Hoffman(pty:pla) filed by Mark Hoffman.(Strauss, Samuel)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8745547
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons