Utah District Court
Judge:Howard C Nielson, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-00915
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025
Case in other court:3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, 240905295
Last checked: Friday Jan 24, 2025 4:14 AM MST
Defendant
Walden School of Liberal Arts
Represented By
Vanessa R. Walsh
Utah Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Greg Hewitt
Utah Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Anabella Sage Jeffers
Represented By
Michael W. Young
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Karthik Narayan Sonty
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/03 9:05 AM
The court construes14 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice as a stipulation of dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(ii). No judicial order is required to effect the dismissal. Case closed. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to case. (dle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
14 14 motion Dismiss Wed 02/26 7:46 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Walden School of Liberal Arts.(Walsh, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/14 4:54 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 12 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 2/18/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/14/2025. No attached document. (med)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 01/14 3:46 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Defendant Walden School of Liberal Arts. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Walsh, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 02, 2025
11 11 utility Reassignment to District Judge Thu 01/02 10:57 AM
NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Ineligible Attorney Thu 12/12 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF INELIGIBLE ATTORNEY -Attorney Patrick M. Ngalamulume, for Plaintiff Anabella Sage Jeffers, has been notified that he/she is not in active status or has not been admitted to practice in this court and can not practice before this court. (sg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
9 9 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Wed 12/11 3:39 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 12/11/2024. (sg)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/11 3:01 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 6 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended to January 16, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 12/11/2024. No attached document. (med)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Modification of Docket Wed 12/11 10:28 AM
Modification of Docket re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply : Error: The document should have been filed using the event "Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer" and linked to the appropriate document. Correction: Event type corrected, docket text modified to correct filing and entry linked to amended complaint. No further action is needed. Please note for future reference.(alf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/10 2:52 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Walden School of Liberal Arts.(Walsh, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Tue 12/10 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Anabella Sage Jeffers, Defendant Walden School of Liberal Arts. Form due by 12/31/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Tue 12/10 10:32 AM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Anabella Sage Jeffers, Defendant Walden School of Liberal Arts. (sg)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Ineligible Attorney Tue 12/10 10:29 AM
NOTICE OF INELIGIBLE ATTORNEY -Attorney Gregg Hewitt, for Defendant Walden School of Liberal Arts, has been notified that he/she is not in active status or has not been admitted to practice in this court and can not practice before this court. Attorney is active and is now added to the case, please disregard. (sg) Modified on 12/10/2024 (sg)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Ineligible Attorney Tue 12/10 10:16 AM
NOTICE OF INELIGIBLE ATTORNEY -Attorney Gregg Hewitt, for Plaintiff Anabella Sage Jeffers, has been notified that he/she is not in active status or has not been admitted to practice in this court and can not practice before this court. (sg)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Atty) Tue 12/10 9:21 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 240905295, (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5266779) filed by Walden School of Liberal Arts. (Walsh, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B- State Court Docket 240905295,
Att: 4 Exhibit C- First Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Summons on Return for Walden School of Liberal Arts
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/10 10:09 AM
Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00915-DAO. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)
Related: [-]