Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Tiffany P Geyer
Case #: 6:24-bk-06700
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Nurses First Solutions, LLC
7061 University Blvd
Winter Park, FL 32792-6720
Represented By
Justin M Luna
Latham, Luna, Eden & Beaudine, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801


Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
75 75 misc Proof of Service (BK) Mon 05/12 2:37 PM
Proof of Service of Order Denying Motion To Use Cash Collateral as Moot. Filed by Justin M Luna on behalf of Debtor Nurses First Solutions, LLC Related [+]. (Luna, Justin)
Related: [-] 74
Att: 1 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
74 74 order Use Cash Collateral Mon 05/12 12:27 PM
Order Denying Motion To Use Cash Collateral as Moot Related [+]. Service Instructions: Justin Luna is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Megan B.)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, May 08, 2025
73 73 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 05/08 4:44 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Justin M Luna and Catherine Choe (Debtor), Andrew Layden, SubV Trustee, Scott Bomkamp (UST), Chad Bowen (Aegis Business Credit), Alvin Cortez, Principal EVIDENCE: Debtor's Exhibits #1-6 (Doc #71): Admitted without Objection, RULING: 1) Confirmation Hearing Amended SubV Plan (First Modification) (Doc #68): Confirmed Consensually Under 1191(a); Order by Luna, Confirmation Affidavit (Doc #69), Ballot Tabulation (Doc #70), Preliminary Hearing: 2) Debtor's Motion to Use Cash Collateral (Doc #5): Denied as Moot, Debtor's Proposed Exhibits re: Cash Collateral (Doc #56), 3) Debtor's Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries (Doc #7): Denied as Moot, Note: Post Confirmation Status Conference Scheduled 10/2/2025 at 10:00 AM (AOCNFNG) (NH) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
72 72 court Exhibit List - Annotated Thu 05/08 11:51 AM
Annotated Exhibit List of Debtor from Hearing Held on 5/8/2025 . (Nadia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
71 71 misc ADI - Exhibit Tue 05/06 9:23 AM
Proposed Exhibits ranging from 1 to 6. 7 documents attached filed on behalf of . Exhibits for the Debtor Related [+]. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-] 55 ,68
70 70 plan Ballot Tabulation Tue 05/06 9:19 AM
Ballot Tabulation Filed by Justin M Luna on behalf of Debtor Nurses First Solutions, LLC.(Luna, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
69 69 notice Notice of Filing (BK) Tue 05/06 9:17 AM
Notice of Filing Confirmation Affidavit of Alvin D. Cortez in Support of Confirmation Filed by Justin M Luna on behalf of Debtor Nurses First Solutions, LLC. (Luna, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix