Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:19-bk-40269

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Kathy A Surratt-States
Case #: 4:24-ap-04045
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Terminated:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust
Wilmington Trust, Registered Agent 1100 N Market St
Wilmington, DE 19890
Represented By
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust
contact info
Plaintiff
Robin Marie Bailey
7613 General Sherman Lane
Saint Louis, MO 63123
Represented By
Stanley L Tate, III
Tate Esq LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, March 14, 2025
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/14 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 03/14/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 03/12 1:30 PM
Order Granting Related [+]. (pot, t)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Robin Marie Bailey
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 03/12 1:33 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:24-ap-4045: Dismissed. (pot, t)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/12 1:37 PM
Adversary Case 4:24-ap-4045 Closed (pot, t)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/11 1:43 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Robin Marie Bailey . (Zup, J)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/11 9:56 AM
Notice of Appearance by Jennifer T Dillow Filed by Defendant National Collegiate Student Loan Trust . (pot, t)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Generic) Mon 03/10 12:14 PM
Notice and Certificate of Service: Filed. Appearance of Counsel Filed by Defendant National Collegiate Student Loan Trust. (Dillow, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 26, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/26 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 01/26/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/26 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 01/26/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, January 24, 2025
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/24 11:03 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Discovery due by 4/8/2025. Trial date set for 4/22/2025 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Egg, M)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robin Marie Bailey
10 10 order Amended Order Fri 01/24 11:01 AM
Amended Order of Court Relating to Trial Related [+]. (Egg, M)
Related: [-] 8 Joint Motion to Continue Trial and Associated Deadlines filed by Defendant National Collegiate Student Loan Trust
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/24 9:59 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by National Collegiate Student Loan Trust. (White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
8 8 motion Generic Motion Fri 01/17 4:06 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial and Associated Deadlines Filed by Defendant National Collegiate Student Loan Trust (White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 12, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/12 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 01/12/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, January 10, 2025
6 6 order Extend Time Fri 01/10 11:09 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint. Related [+] (bai, j)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
5 5 motion Extend Time Wed 01/08 2:42 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint Filed by Defendant National Collegiate Student Loan Trust (White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 12/19 11:04 AM
Summons Service Executed on National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 12/12/2024 (Tate, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
3 3 court Summons and Consent to Entry of Judgment and Orders Issued Wed 12/11 12:35 PM
Summons and Consent to Entry of Judgment and Orders Issued on National Collegiate Student Loan Trust Date Issued 12/11/2024, Answer Due 1/10/2025 Trial date set for 2/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (how, j)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/11 12:32 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Discovery due by 1/28/2025. Trial date set for 2/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (how, j)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robin Marie Bailey
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/10 10:11 AM
Adversary case 24-04045 Complaint by Robin Marie Bailey (attorney Stanley L Tate III) against National Collegiate Student Loan Trust.(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan))(Tate, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet