New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert Kirsch
Referred: Justin T Quinn
Case #: 3:24-cv-11013
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 24, 2025 5:42 AM EST
Defendant
INFINITY FLIGHT GROUP LLC
10 W Piper Ave
Ewing Township, NJ 08628
Defendant
MERCER COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE
1200 Old Trenton Rd
West Windsor Township, NJ 08550
Plaintiff
HAZEM ALSEGINY
Represented By
PANTELIS DIMITRIOS GALLIS
The Law Firm Of Omar T. Mohammedi, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
23 23 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/02 2:04 PM
TEXT ORDER : A Telephone Conference has been scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, May 13, 2025 . Participants are directed to dial (855) 244-8681 and when prompted, enter access code 2303 040 4763 followed by ##. So Ordered by Judge Robert Kirsch on 05/02/2025. (pdm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
misc QC - Generic Message Wed 03/26 8:29 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The22 Notice filed by Pantelis Gallis on 3/25/2025 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice (Other). FOR FUTURE FILINGS PLEASE USE THE EVENT **Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case** EVENT. The Clerk has terminated Pantelis Gallis as counsel for Plaintiff HAZEM ALSEGINY. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/25 4:11 PM
NOTICE by HAZEM ALSEGINY Withdrawal of Counsel (GALLIS, PANTELIS)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/25 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by FATIMA MOHAMMED ABUGHANNAM on behalf of HAZEM ALSEGINY (ABUGHANNAM, FATIMA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
20 20 order Order Reassigning Case Wed 03/19 3:56 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert Kirsch for all further proceedings. Judge Georgette Castner no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/19/2025. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/06 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by NIGYAR ALIEVA on behalf of INFINITY FLIGHT GROUP LLC (ALIEVA, NIGYAR)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Substitution of Attorney Thu 03/06 2:49 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney RACHEL MOSESON DIKOVICS terminated. Attorney JEFFREY W. MORYAN for INFINITY FLIGHT GROUP LLC added.. (MORYAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
17 17 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 02/21 5:21 PM
Exhibit to16 Letter, QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney, Declaration of Omar T. Mohammedi, Esq., In Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission Related [+] by HAZEM ALSEGINY. (GALLIS, PANTELIS)
Related: [-] sumbitted
qc QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney Fri 02/21 11:19 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Declaration of Omar T. Mohammedi, Esq. [16-1] submitted by PANTELIS GALLIS on 2/18/25 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DECLARATION ONLY WITH A SCANNED SIGNATURE USING *EXHIBIT(TO DOCUMENT)*. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (amv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Tue 02/18 5:14 PM
Letter from Pantelis D. Gallis Constituting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission.(GALLIS, PANTELIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Omar T. Mohammedi, Esq., In Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A Omar T. Mohammedi Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice
15 15 misc Letter Tue 02/18 3:40 PM
Letter from Pantelis D. Gallis. (GALLIS, PANTELIS)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Tue 02/18 11:21 AM
Letter from Pantelis D. Gallis.(GALLIS, PANTELIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit IFG Letter to Plaintiff dated January 28, 2025,
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff Letter to IFG dated January 29, 2025,
Att: 3 Exhibit Plaintiff Letter to MCCC dated May 7, 2024,
Att: 4 Exhibit MCCC Letter to Plaintiff dated May 22, 2024
Friday, February 14, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Fri 02/14 11:26 AM
Letter from Michele Weckerly re10 Letter. (WECKERLY, MICHELE)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 02/14 10:59 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by INFINITY FLIGHT GROUP LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (DIKOVICS, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 02/14 10:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCER COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE identifying STATE OF NEW JERSEY as Corporate Parent.. (WECKERLY, MICHELE)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Letter Fri 02/14 9:22 AM
Letter from Michele Weckerly. (WECKERLY, MICHELE)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/14 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELE LYNN WECKERLY on behalf of MERCER COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE (WECKERLY, MICHELE)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Document Not Signed by Attorney Fri 02/14 11:15 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The10 Letter submitted by Michele Weckerly on 2/14/2025 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
8 8 misc Letter Thu 02/13 4:05 PM
Letter from Rachel M. Dikovics requesting pre-motion conference regarding IFG's proposed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (DIKOVICS, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 01/31 8:34 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MERCER COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/14/2025. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
7 7 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 01/30 2:11 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Mercer County Community College. Attorney PERRY L. LATTIBOUDERE for MERCER COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE added. (LATTIBOUDERE, PERRY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
6 6 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 01/28 12:06 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Infinity Flight Group LLC.. (DIKOVICS, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/28 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL MOSESON DIKOVICS on behalf of INFINITY FLIGHT GROUP LLC (DIKOVICS, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 01/28 2:28 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by INFINITY FLIGHT GROUP LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/14/2025. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/13 4:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by HAZEM ALSEGINY. INFINITY FLIGHT GROUP LLC served on 1/10/2025, answer due 1/31/2025. (GALLIS, PANTELIS)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/13 4:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by HAZEM ALSEGINY. MERCER COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE served on 1/10/2025, answer due 1/31/2025. (GALLIS, PANTELIS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 12/11 8:48 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to INFINITY FLIGHT GROUP LLC, MERCER COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (amv)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 12/11 8:47 AM
Judge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn added. (amv)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Wed 12/11 8:48 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (amv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/10 3:05 PM
COMPLAINT against INFINITY FLIGHT GROUP LLC, MERCER COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15865683) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HAZEM ALSEGINY.(GALLIS, PANTELIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet