Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Matthew W Brann
Case #: 4:24-cv-02121
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Terminated:Jan 31, 2025
Case in other court:Centre County Court of Common Pleas, 2024-CV-3019
Last checked: Friday Jan 24, 2025 5:47 AM EST
Defendant
National Gas & Electric, LLC
Represented By
Michael Pest
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Allen
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Hafer
Represented By
Jeremy C. Jackson
Bower Law Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, January 31, 2025
misc Docket Annotation Fri 01/31 6:21 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to6 Stipulation for Dismissal. (jr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 01/27 5:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jonathan Hafer, National Gas & Electric, LLC (Jackson, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
5 5 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/08 3:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 2/3/2025 at 02:30 PM before Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 1/8/2025. (ea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/17 11:39 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by National Gas & Electric, LLC.(Pest, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Wed 12/11 12:48 PM
Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 12/11/2024. (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) Tue 12/10 3:53 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by National Gas & Electric, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TxEx Energy Investments, LLC for National Gas & Electric, LLC. (Allen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice for Removal Tue 12/10 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Gas & Electric, LLC from Centre County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024-CV-3019. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 6838665), filed by National Gas & Electric, LLC.(nr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Centre County Court of Common Pleas Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet