Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Sunil R Harjani
Case #: 1:24-cv-12695
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 24, 2025 4:48 AM CST
Defendant
Thomas Cioppa
USCIS Chicago Chicago District Office 101 West Congress Parkway
Chicago, IL 60605
Represented By
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Craig Arthur Oswald
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
U.S. Department of Homeland Security 2707 Martin Luther King Jr Ave SE
Washington, DC 20528
Represented By
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Craig Arthur Oswald
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Defendant
Antony J. Blinken
Represented By
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Craig Arthur Oswald
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Defendant
Christopher A. Wray
as the Director of the FBI Federal Bureau of Investigations 935 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20535
Represented By
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Craig Arthur Oswald
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Plaintiff
Mohammed Jebreen
Represented By
Reem H Odeh
Law Offices Of Reem H. Odeh
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/10/2024 5:52 PM CST
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT filed by MOHAMMED JEBREEN ; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22824249.(Odeh, Reem)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
2 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MOHAMMED JEBREEN by Reem H Odeh (Odeh, Reem)
Related: [-]