Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 3:24-bk-34018
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
56 56 motion Compensation Wed 05/07 11:44 PM
Application for compensation -- First Interim Fee Application of Weycer, Kaplan, Pulaski & Zuber, P.C. as Counsel to the Debtor and Debtor in Possession -- for Jeffery D. Carruth, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 12/10/2024 to 4/25/2025, Fee: $31,941.00, Expenses: $1,208.94. Filed by Attorney Jeffery D. Carruth Objections due by 5/28/2025. (Carruth, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 05, 2025
55 55 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Mon 05/05 9:48 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert Padjen filed by Interested Party Colorado Energy and Carbon Management Commission. (Padjen, Robert)
Related: [-]