Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Sue E Myerscough
Referred: Douglas J Quivey
Case #: 3:24-cv-03343
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 3:42 AM CST
Defendant
Chassity Anderson
Defendant
Illinois Highway Patrol
Represented By
Todd Nelson
Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
J Lofton
Represented By
Todd Nelson
Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Adris Easley
911 Bluff Street
Hannibal, MO 63401


Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
order Order Wed 05/14 8:50 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Doug Quivey on 5/14/2025: Because the 8/21/2025 10:30 a.m. telephonic Status Conference is reset in front of Judge Doug Quivey, the parties are to call in to 551-285-1373 then enter meeting ID 160 363 06109. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 05/13 8:08 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/21/2025 at 10:30 a.m. via telephone before Magistrate Judge Douglas J Quivey. (LN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
order Order Assigning Referral Judge Mon 05/12 12:03 PM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to File ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/07 3:44 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 5/7/2025: Before the Court is Plaintiff Easley's second Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (d/e28 ).Plaintiff's proposed amended complaint consists of his first Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (d/e23 ) attached to the original Complaint (d/e1 ). This Court previously denied Plaintiff's first Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (d/e23 ) because it "only contain[ed] additional counts" adding on to his original Complaint (d/e1 ). See February 24, 2025, Text Order. Further, Plaintiff's original Complaint (d/e1 ) contains claims against Defendant Chastity Anderson, and "all claims against Defendant Chastity Anderson [have since been] severed into a new separate action." See February 11, 2025, Text Order.The Court does not accept piecemeal complaints, and both the copy of the original Complaint and the copy of the first Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint within the proposed amended complaint are deficient. Plaintiff's Motion (d/e28 ) is therefore DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a blank complaint form. Plaintiff may refile a Third Amended Complaint on that form and include all of his claims against only the Defendants in this case on or before May 21, 2025. The Court reiterates that it will not accept copies of previously filed complaints as a Third Amended Complaint. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
28 28 motion Leave to File Document Tue 05/06 4:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Justin Adris Easley. Responses due by 5/20/2025. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
minutes Status Conference - Referral Judge ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/23 10:55 AM
Minute entry for proceedings held on 4/23/2025 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance by plaintiff Justin Easley. Appearance on behalf of defendants by Joseph Bracey and Todd Nelson. Status hearing held by phone. Status of the case and Amended Complaint discussed. Plaintiff's deadline to amend pleadings is set for 5/7/2025. Defendant Anderson is terminated in this case and the claim is proceeding under case number 25-3041 Further status hearing set for 8/21/2025 at 10:30AM by telephone from Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Parties should dial 551-285-1373, then enter meeting ID 160 924 96574 for the call. (Tape #UR-B: 10:46AM.) (JMB)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/28 4:05 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/28/2025. The court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for March 12, 2025. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Joint Proposed Discovery Schedule pursuant to the Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting24 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due March 28, 2025; amended pleadings and joinder of parties due April 28, 2025; discovery closes November 10, 2025; case dispositive motions due December 10, 2025. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for April 23, 2025 at 10:45 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 551-285-1373, then enter meeting ID 160 924 96574. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 02/24 2:34 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 2/24/2025: Before the Court is Defendant Illinois Highway Patrol's Motion to Dismiss (d/e17 ) and Plaintiff Easley's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (d/e23 ).Since Plaintiff's proposed amended complaint only contains additional counts, and not the Complaint's (d/e1 ) original counts, Plaintiff's Motion (d/e23 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff is directed to refile one Second Amended Complaint containing all claims. Defendant's Motion (d/e17 ) is DISMISSED as moot and Defendant is directed to respond to Plaintiff's forthcoming Second Amended Complaint. (BMG)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
26 26 service Certificate of Service Fri 02/21 3:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Initial Disclosures by Justin Adris Easley. (BMG)
Related: [-]
25 25 6 pgs misc Memorandum Fri 02/21 3:42 PM
MEMORANDUM re23 MOTION for Leave to File by Justin Adris Easley. (BMG)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Discovery Plan - Proposed/Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 02/21 3:18 PM
DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Illinois Highway Patrol, J Lofton. (Nelson, Todd)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Leave to File Document Fri 02/21 2:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Justin Adris Easley. Responses due by 3/7/2025. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/11 2:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by J Lofton. (RAH)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Sever Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 02/11 8:31 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 2/11/2025: Before the Court are Defendant Chastity Anderson's Motion to Sever Claims Against Defendant Chastity Anderson (d/e14 ) and Plaintiff Justin Adris Easley's Motion to Object and Dismiss Motion to Sever Claims against Defendant Chastity Anderson (d/e21 ). Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21, "the court may at any time, on just terms, add or drop a party [and] also sever any claim against a party." Plaintiff's Complaint states that the traffic stop underlying his claims against Defendants Lofton and Illinois Highway Patrol occurred on April 4, 2024 (see d/e1 , pp. 5, 6-7). Plaintiff's Complaint also states that the interaction with Defendant Anderson underlying his claims against her occurred on July 2, 2024 (see id. at p. 6). Therefore, all claims against Defendant Chastity Anderson are severed into a new separate action, Defendant's Motion (d/e14 ) is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's Motion (d/e21 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court shall extract the Complaint (d/e1 ) and create a new case for all claims against Defendant Chastity Anderson. Any case filing fees shall be waived. The Clerk shall also correct Defendant Chassity Anderson's name in the docket to Chastity Anderson (see d/e13 ). (RAH)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/11 2:21 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/11/2025: Defendant Javier A. Lofton filed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint1 after the deadline had already passed. Defendant's Motion20 is GRANTED for the reasons stated in the motion. The Clerk is directed to file Exhibit A [20-1] as Defendant's Answer. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
21 21 motion Dismiss Thu 02/06 1:55 PM
MOTION to Object and Dismiss14 Motion to Sever Claims against defendant Chastity Anderson by Plaintiff Justin Adris Easley. Responses due by 2/20/2025. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/05 12:43 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Instanter) by Defendant J Lofton. Responses due by 2/19/2025(Nelson, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
19 19 notice Notice Rule 12(C) entered Tue 02/04 8:58 AM
RULE 12(C) NOTICE entered re17 MOTION to Dismiss. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
18 18 6 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion/Petition Mon 02/03 4:22 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Illinois Highway Patrol. (Nelson, Todd)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Mon 02/03 4:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Illinois Highway Patrol. Responses due by 2/18/2025 (Nelson, Todd)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/03 8:58 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE AND JURY DEMAND BY DEFENDANT CHASTITY ANDERSON by Chassity Anderson.(Bracey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
15 15 21 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference (Rule 16) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/27 3:54 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/27/2025. This matter is scheduled for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by personal appearance before U.S. Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on March 12, 2025, at 9:45 a.m., Courtroom B, U.S. Courthouse, 201 South Vine Street, Urbana, Illinois. If an agreed discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) is filed seven days before the hearing, the Court will adopt the schedule and vacate the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. See written Order. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
14 14 motion Sever Thu 01/23 11:29 AM
MOTION to Sever MOTION TO SEVER CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT CHASTITY ANDERSON by Defendant Chassity Anderson. Responses due by 2/6/2025 (Bracey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Thu 01/23 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph Bracey on behalf of Chassity Anderson (Bracey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Thu 01/23 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Julie M Koerner on behalf of Chassity Anderson (Koerner, Julie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/16 11:33 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/16/2025: Defendants' Motion for Leave to file their Answer11 to Plaintiff's Complaint1 is granted for the reasons stated therein. Defendants' Answer must be filed by February 3, 2025. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/15 10:19 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Defendants J Lofton, Illinois Highway Patrol. Responses due by 1/29/2025 (Nelson, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Mon 01/13 2:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Adris Easley. Chassity Anderson served on 1/13/2025, answer due 2/3/2025. (RAH)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Mon 01/13 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Todd Nelson on behalf of J Lofton, Illinois Highway Patrol (Nelson, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 01/07 1:13 AM
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Thu 01/02 2:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Adris Easley. J Lofton served on 12/19/2024, answer due 1/9/2025. (DW)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Thu 01/02 2:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Adris Easley. Illinois Highway Patrol served on 12/19/2024, answer due 1/9/2025. (DW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 12/19 8:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Chassity Anderson, Illinois Highway Patrol, J Lofton. Sent to USMS for Service. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
5 5 misc Response (NOT to a motion/petition) Thu 12/19 8:38 AM
Response to Text Order entered 12/11/2024 by Justin Adris Easley. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 12/11 8:29 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 12/11/2024: On 12/10/2024, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3), the Court directed the Clerk to prepare a Summons and Marshal's Form USM 285 for service of Complaint on defendants by U.S. Marshal's Office. Plaintiff is ordered to provide to the Clerk's office within 21 days of this Order the addresses of each defendant named in the Complaint1 where the defendants can be served. Failure to provide the addresses for defendants may result in dismissal of the complaint. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 12/10 2:27 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 12/10/2024: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis2 is GRANTED. The Court is satisfied plaintiff is indigent. In his application to proceed without prepayment of fees, plaintiff signed a declaration reflecting that he has no income, no savings, nothing of value, and $4,000 in financial obligations2 . Plaintiff is allowed to proceed without prepayment of costs. The Clerk is directed to prepare a Summons and Marshal's Form USM 285 for service of Complaint on defendants by U.S. Marshal's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is to notify the parties of their option to consent to disposition of this case before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by providing the plaintiff with a Magistrate Judge consent form and accompanying Court explanation (attached hereto). (RAH)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Request Counsel Tue 12/10 2:31 PM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 12/10/2024: Before the Court is plaintiff's motion requesting counsel be appointed for him3 . When ruling on a request for pro bono counsel under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(1), the district court is to make the following inquiries: (1) whether the plaintiff made a reasonable attempt to obtain counsel or has been effectively precluded from doing so; and if so, (2) given the difficulty of the case, whether the plaintiff appears to be competent to litigate it himself. Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). The first inquiry is a mandatory threshold determination and requires the plaintiff attempt to obtain a lawyer independently. Eagan v. Dempsey, 987 F.3d 667, 682 (7th Cir. 2021). There is no indication in the record before this Court that plaintiff has made any attempt to independently secure counsel prior filing the motions asking the Court to appoint counsel for him. Therefore, the Court finds plaintiff has not satisfied the first threshold inquiry. Plaintiff's Motion to Request Counsel3 is DENIED. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
3 3 motion Request Counsel Tue 12/10 12:31 PM
MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Justin Adris Easley. Responses due by 12/23/2024. (RAH)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 12/10 12:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Justin Adris Easley. Responses due by 12/23/2024. (RAH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/10 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Chassity Anderson, Illinois Highway Patrol, filed by Justin Adris Easley. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope