Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-20399
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 2:13 AM EST
Defendant
Efrain Betancourt, Jr (1)
Represented By
Richard John Diaz
contact info
Richard Lawrence Cooper
The Law Offices Of Richard L. Cooper
contact info
Dustin M Tischler
Dustin Tischler P.A
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Gabrielle Raemy Charest-Turken
Doj-Usao
contact info
Roger Cruz
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 3:43 PM EDT
Thursday, September 12, 2024
1 1 MOTION TO SEAL by USA as to Efrain Betancourt, Jr. (at)
Related: [-]
2 2 SEALED ORDER granting1 Motion TO SEAL as to Efrain Betancourt Jr (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 9/12/2024). (See attached document for full details). (at)
Related: [-]
3 3 12 pgs INDICTMENT as to Efrain Betancourt, Jr (1) count(s) 1, 2-7. FORFEITURE. (at) (at).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/16/2024) Restricted Unredacted Indictment