Tara Hill Owner, LLC v. Laura Malagon et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John W Holcomb |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-02663 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment |
Case Filed: | Dec 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Dec 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 2:38 AM PST |
Defendant
Diego Malagon Corona
|
|
Defendant
Patricia Corona
|
|
Defendant
Cynthia Mamolejo Flores
|
|
Defendant
Francisco Malagon
2130 West Crescent Avenue, Unit 2005
Anaheim, CA 92801 |
|
Defendant
Laura Malagon
|
|
Plaintiff
Tara Hill Owner, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court, County of Orange. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court, County of Orange. (yl) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb DENYING2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). This case is REMANDED to state court as explained in the attached statement. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (yl) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Francisco Malagon. (et) |
|
2 | 2
![]() REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Francisco Malagon. (et) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Orange, case number 30-02024 01419660-CL-UD-CJC with CONFORMED E-FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott., filed by Defendant Francisco Malagon.. (et) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |