Original Case: 5:24-cv-01266

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-pr-06259
Typeprisoner appeal / state / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2024
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 3:32 AM MST
Defendant - Appellee
OKLAHOMA PARDON AND PAROLE BOARD
Represented By
Zachary Paul West
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Garry Michael Gaskins II
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Kyle Peppler
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TOM BATES, in his official capacity as Director of the Pardon and Parole Board
Represented By
Zachary Paul West
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Garry Michael Gaskins II
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Kyle Peppler
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RICHARD MILLER, in his official capacity as Chairperson of the Pardon and Parole Board
Represented By
Zachary Paul West
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Garry Michael Gaskins II
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Kyle Peppler
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
KEVIN R. UNDERWOOD
Represented By
Hunter S. Labovitz
Office of the Federal Public Defender
contact info
Brendan Mathew Van Winkle
Office of the Federal Public Defender
contact info
Emma Victoria Rolls
Office of the Federal Public Defender
contact info

GPO Dec 23 2024
[11146539] Frap 42; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished. Judges Matheson, Bacharach and Rossman. [24-6259]

Docket last updated: 12/25/2024 3:32 AM MST
Sunday, December 08, 2024
[11142423] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/08/2024. Notice of appearance, transcript order form, designation of record, docketing statement and appointment motion due 12/23/2024 by Kevin Underwood. Notice of appearance due on 12/23/2024 for Tom Bates, Richard Miller and Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board. 24-6259 --[Edited to add docketing statement 12/09/2024 by SLS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 18 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - With Counsel
[11142425] Appellant's motion filed by Kevin Underwood for stay of clemency proceedings and execution. Served on 12/09/2024. Manner of Service: email. 24-6259
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 13 pgs Attachment 1
Att: 3 10 pgs Attachment 2
2 pgs [11142427] Order filed by Judges Matheson, Bacharach and Rossman. Response to appellant's motion for stay due on or before 4:00 p.m. Central Standard Time on 12/09/2024 for Tom Bates, Richard Miller and Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board. Reply due on or before 4:00 p.m. Central Standard Time on 12/10/2024 by Kevin R. Underwood. The court enters a temporary stay of clemency proceedings scheduled for 12/09/2024. Served on 12/09/2024. 24-6259 --[Edited 12/09/2024 by SLS to correct filing date and to correct time of reply deadline.]
Related: [-]