Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mia Roberts Perez
Case #: 2:24-cv-06597
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 4:53 AM EST
Defendant
ROCK RIDGE INSURANCE COMPANY
B7 Tabonuco Street Suite 912
Guaynabo, PR 00968
Represented By
JOSEPH ACQUAVIVA
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Stasny
Represented By
MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY
Zenstein Kovalsky, LLC
contact info
JOSEPH A. ZENSTEIN
Zenstein Kovalsky, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Stasny
Represented By
MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY
Zenstein Kovalsky, LLC
contact info
JOSEPH A. ZENSTEIN
Zenstein Kovalsky, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
OPENLY INSURANCE LLC
Terminated: 12/13/2024
Represented By
JOSEPH ACQUAVIVA
Marshall Dennehey
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/05 1:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 9/15/25. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 10/13/25. MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 12/8/25. PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM ARE DUE BY 1/5/26. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 1/7/26 AT 4:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 6A. THIS MATTER IS IN THE JURY TRIAL POOL BEGINNING ON 1/20/26; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 5/5/25. 5/5/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Mon 05/05 11:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ Pretrial/Rule 16 Conference held on 5/5/25. (JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 discov Discovery Plan Mon 04/14 4:08 PM
Discovery Plan by Elizabeth Stasny, John Stasny.(KOVALSKY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/06 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH ACQUAVIVA on behalf of ROCK RIDGE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(ACQUAVIVA, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 03/04 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/5/2025 10:30 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ. 3/4/2025 ENTERED AND EMAILED (Mountney, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 12/13 2:42 PM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 12/13/24. 12/13/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Fri 12/13 2:36 PM
STIPULATED AND ORDER THAT AMONG COUNSEL THAT ROCK RIDGE INSURANCE COMPANY IS HEREBY SUBSTITUTED AS THE PARTY DEFENDANTFOR OPENLY INSURANCE LLC D/B/A ROCK RIDGE INSURANCE COMPANY RELATIVE TO THE COMPLAINT ANDALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS AND COURT FILINGS; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 12/11/24. 12/13/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 misc State Court Record - Attachment Thu 12/12 12:24 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
Related: [-]
5 5 6 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/12 10:34 AM
ANSWER to Complaint together with With Affirmative Defenses by OPENLY INSURANCE LLC.(ACQUAVIVA, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - POLICY
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/11 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY on behalf of John Stasny, Elizabeth Stasny with Jury Demand(KOVALSKY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Stipulation Wed 12/11 12:00 PM
STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY DEFENDANT by OPENLY INSURANCE LLC. (ACQUAVIVA, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 12/11 8:22 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Clear Blue Insurance Company by Openly Insuance LLC d/b/a Rock Ridge Insurance Company.(ACQUAVIVA, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Wed 12/11 8:18 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Openly Insuance LLC d/b/a Rock Ridge Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17936243), filed by Openly Insuance LLC d/b/a Rock Ridge Insurance Company.(ACQUAVIVA, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Designation Form,
Att: 4 Designation Form,
Att: 5 Exhibit A - WRIT OF SUMMONS,
Att: 6 38 pgs Exhibit B - COMPLAINT