Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Case #: 3:24-cv-03090
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 4:27 AM CST
Defendant
Quintessa LLC
Represented By
Jessica Dale Cox
Lynn Pinker Hurst & Schwegmann
contact info
Christopher J Schwegmann
Lynn Pinker Hurst & Schwegmann LLP
contact info
Defendant
Slocumb Law Firm LLC
Plaintiff
Kelly Pinn
Represented By
Ethan Mark Preston
Preston Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/29 9:58 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting29 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants InfoWorx Direct, LLC and Ronald Perlstein must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 16, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/29/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/28 3:39 PM
Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by InfoWorx Direct LLC (Cleveland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
28 28 respm Response/Objection Fri 04/25 3:55 PM
RESPONSE filed by Kelly Bland re:21 MOTION to Dismiss (Preston, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 04/18 9:23 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting26 Unopposed Motion to Continue. Plaintiff must file a response to Defendant Quintessa LLC's Motion to Dismiss on or before April 25, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/18/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
26 26 motion Continue Thu 04/17 11:46 AM
Consent MOTION to Continue Bland's Time to Oppose Quintessa, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Kelly Bland with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Preston, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/16 11:42 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants InfoWorx Direct, LLC and Ronald Perlstein must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 2, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/16/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/15 4:27 PM
Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Ronald Perlstein (Cleveland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
23 23 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/15 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph F Cleveland, Jr on behalf of Ronald Perlstein. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Cleveland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
22 22 service Summons Returned Tue 04/01 10:14 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to InfoWorx Direct LLC ; served on 3/26/2025; Ronald Perlstein ; served on 3/26/2025. (Preston, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
21 21 motion Dismiss Mon 03/31 7:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Quintessa LLC (Cox, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Appendix,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s),
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
20 20 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 03/12 9:08 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as moot8 Motion to Dismiss in light of18 Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 3/12/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
19 19 service Summons Issued Tue 03/11 12:03 PM
Summons Issued as to InfoWorx Direct LLC, Ronald Perlstein, Quintessa LLC. (ndt)
Related: [-]
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/11 3:04 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Quintessa LLC, InfoWorx Direct LLC, RONALD PERLSTEIN filed by Kelly Bland. Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Preston, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
17 17 22 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 03/04 10:19 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting16 Motion for protective order. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 3/4/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
16 16 motion Protective Order Mon 03/03 2:27 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Quintessa LLC (Cox, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 02/18 9:36 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting14 Motion to Dismiss. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Slocumb Law Firm LLC without prejudice, with each party to pay its own costs. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 2/18/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
14 14 motion Dismiss Fri 02/14 5:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Slocumb Law Firm, LLC under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed by Kelly Pinn (Preston, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/11 10:29 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Lead Intelligence Inc d/b/a Verisk Marketing Solutions on 2/6/2025. (ykp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/06 8:08 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob U Ginsburg on behalf of Kelly Pinn. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Ginsburg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
11 11 misc Stipulation Tue 02/04 1:39 PM
STIPULATION of Parties Under Rule 26(d) Regarding Subpoena Duces Tecums by Quintessa LLC. (Cox, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 01/30 3:35 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting9 Motion to Continue. Pinns must file an amended complaint under Rule 15(a)(1)(B) on or before March 11, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/30/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
9 9 motion Continue Wed 01/29 4:07 PM
Consent MOTION to Continue Pinn's Time to File an Amended Complaint under Federal Rule 15(a)(1)(B) filed by Kelly Pinn with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Preston, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
8 8 motion Dismiss Fri 01/24 3:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Quintessa LLC (Schwegmann, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, December 30, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Returned Mon 12/30 11:56 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Slocumb Law Firm LLC. Waiver sent on 12/20/2024. (Preston, Ethan)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/30 10:07 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer is due on or before Friday, January 24, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/30/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline (Public Entry) Mon 12/30 11:38 AM
Answer due from Quintessa LLC on 1/24/2025 per 6 Order. (ykp)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/27 3:09 PM
Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Quintessa LLCAttorney Jessica Dale Cox added to party Quintessa LLC(pty:dft) (Cox, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 12/11 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Quintessa LLC, Slocumb Law Firm LLC. (knb)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Boyle Wed 12/11 4:08 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge McKay). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (knb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 12/11 11:31 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kelly Pinn. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Preston, Ethan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/11 11:08 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Quintessa LLC, Slocumb Law Firm LLC filed by Kelly Pinn. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15119431) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Preston, Ethan)
Related: [-]