Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-11161

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:24-ap-50280
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global
222 N. Pacific Coast Highway Suite 300
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Albert Kass
Kcc Llc Dba Verita Global
contact info
Defendant
Voizzit Technology Private Ltd.
Represented By
Voizzit Technology Private Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Voizzit Information Technology LLC
Represented By
Voizzit Information Technology LLC
contact info
Defendant
Think and Learn Pvt. Ltd
Represented By
Think and Learn Pvt. Ltd
contact info
Defendant
Rajendran Vellapalath
Represented By
Rajendran Vellapalath
contact info
Plaintiff
Claudia Z. Springer, as the Chapter 11 Trustee to Epic! Creations, Inc., Neuron Fuel, Inc. and Tangible Play, Inc.
Represented By
Melissa M. Root
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Joseph Charles Barsalona II
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Henry Jon Jaffe
Pashmanstein Walder Hayden PC
contact info
Catherine L. Steege
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Alexis R. Gambale
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
30 30 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 03/27 10:52 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Claudia Z. Springer, Claudia Z. Springer. Hearing scheduled for 3/31/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Gambale, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
29 29 order Withdraw As Attorney Wed 03/26 1:18 PM
Order Authorizing Kevin S. Mann, Cross & Simon, LLC, Maureen V. Abbey Scorese, and Chugh LLP to Withdraw as Counsel. Related [+] Order Signed on 3/26/2025. (JMW) Modified on 3/27/2025 (JMW)
Related: [-] 26 ,28
28 28 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Wed 03/26 9:58 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Related [+] Filed by Rajendran Vellapalath, Voizzit Information Technology LLC, Voizzit Technology Private Ltd.. (Mann, Kevin)
Related: [-] 26
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
27 27 answer Objection Wed 03/19 12:24 PM
Objection /Chapter 11 Trustee's Limited Objection to Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for the Voizzit Parties Related [+] Filed by Claudia Z. Springer, Claudia Z. Springer. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-] 86 , 551 , 570 551 ,26 , 104 , 570
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
26 26 motion Withdraw As Attorney - Motion Wed 03/05 10:12 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney //Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Filed by Rajendran Vellapalath, Voizzit Information Technology LLC, Voizzit Technology Private Ltd.. Hearing scheduled for 3/31/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/19/2025. (Mann, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/19 4:23 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Rajendran Vellapalath, Voizzit Information Technology LLC, Voizzit Technology Private Ltd. Mediation due date: 06/20/2025.(Mann, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
24 24 court Case Reassigned Wed 01/29 4:22 PM
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. Involvement of Judge John T Dorsey Terminated (LJH)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/20 1:32 PM
Certificate of Service re 1) Order Granting Chapter 11 Trustee's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction; and 2) Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 19, 2024 at 1:00 P.M. (ET) Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 20 ,21
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/20 1:28 PM
Certificate of Service re 1) Notice of Filing of Proposed Order Granting Chapter 11 Trustees Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; and 2) Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 19, 2024 at 1:00 P.M. (ET) Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 17 ,18
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
21 21 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/18 10:43 AM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Claudia Z. Springer, Claudia Z. Springer. Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2024 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-]
20 20 4 pgs order Order Wed 12/18 10:25 AM
Order Granting Chapter 11 Trustees Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction. Related [+] Order Signed on 12/18/2024. (NWW)
Related: [-] 2 ,17 ,19
19 19 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Wed 12/18 7:59 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Chapter 11 Trustee's Request For Entry of a Preliminary Injunction in Connection with Her Trustes Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Related [+] Filed by Claudia Z. Springer. (Gambale, Alexis)
Related: [-] 2 ,12 ,17
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
18 18 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 12/17 11:20 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Claudia Z. Springer, Claudia Z. Springer. Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2024 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Exhibit Tue 12/17 9:49 AM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Proposed Order Granting Chapter 11 Trustees Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction Related [+] Filed by Claudia Z. Springer. (Gambale, Alexis)
Related: [-] 2
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed PI Order
Monday, December 16, 2024
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/16 12:37 PM
Certificate of Service re 1) Complaint for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief, and to Enforce the Automatic Stay; and 2) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 1 ,13
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/16 12:34 PM
Certificate of Service re Order Granting Chapter 11 Trustee's Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, December 12, 2024
14 14 17 pgs misc Transcript Thu 12/12 3:20 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 12/11/24 RE: Trustees Emergency Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 3/12/2025. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at telephone number 302-654-8080. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 12/19/2024. Redaction Request Due By 1/2/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 1/13/2025. Transcript access will be restricted through 3/12/2025. (SAP)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 12/12 10:39 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants Think and Learn Pvt. Ltd, Rajendran Vellapalath, Voizzit Information Technology LLC, Voizzit Technology Private Ltd.. Related [+] (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
12 12 order Temporary Restraining Order Wed 12/11 4:25 PM
Order Granting Chapter 11 Trustees Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/11/2024. (LJH)
Related: [-] 2
11 11 audio Wed 12/11 11:10 AM
Court Date & Time [12/11/2024 10:01:28 AM]. File Size [ 8684 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:18:16 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Minute Entry Wed 12/11 10:27 AM
Minute Entry Re:6 ; Virtual Emergency Hearing Held Re: (Adv. D.I.2 ); Trustees Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Complaint for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief, and to Enforce the Automatic Stay Adv. D.I.1 ORDER GRANTED; order to be uploaded for signing; Appearances: (See Attached Registration Sheet) Related [+] (NWW)
Related: [-] 1 ,2 ,6
9 9 court Request for Transcript Wed 12/11 10:14 AM
Request for Transcript of hearing held on December 11, 2024 received. To obtain a copy of this transcript, contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Reliable Companies , Telephone number 3026548080 Related [+].
Related: [-] 6 liable Companies
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
8 8 crditcrd none Tue 12/10 10:02 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 24-50280 JTD] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A11932217, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/10 6:29 PM
Certificate of Service re: Documents Served on December 10, 2024 Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 1 ,2 ,3 ,4 ,5 ,6
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Tue 12/10 2:21 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Claudia Z. Springer, as the Chapter 11 Trustee to Epic! Creations, Inc., Neuron Fuel, Inc. and Tangible Play, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2024 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Tue 12/10 2:16 PM
Notice of Hearing Regarding Trustee's Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order Related [+] Filed by Claudia Z. Springer, as the Chapter 11 Trustee to Epic! Creations, Inc., Neuron Fuel, Inc. and Tangible Play, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2024 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2 ,3 ,4
4 4 misc Declaration Tue 12/10 1:47 PM
Declaration of Jacob Grall in Support of Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Related [+] Filed by Claudia Z. Springer, as the Chapter 11 Trustee to Epic! Creations, Inc., Neuron Fuel, Inc. and Tangible Play, Inc.. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2 ,3
Att: 1 Exhibit A
3 3 19 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Tue 12/10 1:46 PM
Memorandum of Law /Chapter 11 Trustee's Memorandum of Law in Support of Chapter 11 Trustees Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Related [+] Filed by Claudia Z. Springer, as the Chapter 11 Trustee to Epic! Creations, Inc., Neuron Fuel, Inc. and Tangible Play, Inc.. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order - Motion Tue 12/10 1:44 PM
Motion for Temporary Restraining Order /Trustee's Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Related [+] Filed by Claudia Z. Springer, as the Chapter 11 Trustee to Epic! Creations, Inc., Neuron Fuel, Inc. and Tangible Play, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2024 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 12/10 1:42 PM
Adversary case 24-50280 Complaint for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief, and to Enforce the Automatic Stay by Claudia Z. Springer, as the Chapter 11 Trustee to Epic! Creations, Inc., Neuron Fuel, Inc. and Tangible Play, Inc. against Voizzit Technology Private Ltd., Voizzit Information Technology LLC, Think and Learn Pvt. Ltd, Rajendran Vellapalath. Fee Amount $350 (72 (Injunctive relief - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 3/10/2025. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A