Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:David L Bunning
Referred: Candace J Smith
Case #: 2:24-cv-00215
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 24, 2025 5:27 AM EST
Defendant
City of Newport
Defendant
Ronald Lalumandier
Official Defendant
Ronald Lalumandier
Plaintiff
Brandon Rettig
Represented By
Matthew E. Miller-Novak
Barron Peck Bennie & Schlemmer - Cincinnati
contact info
Robert L. Thompson
Thompson Legal LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
14 14 discov Certificate of Service Mon 04/14 3:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defs Initial Disclosures by City of Newport, Ronald Lalumandier, Ronald Lalumandier.(Mando, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
13 13 discov Certificate of Service Tue 04/08 10:53 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendants First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, and Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff by City of Newport, Ronald Lalumandier, Ronald Lalumandier.(Mando, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/24 3:47 PM
ORDER: Matt Miller-Novaks Motion to Withdraw9 is hereby granted. The Clerk may term Attorney Miller-Novak from the docket sheet and remove him from the case electronic service list. Plaintiff Rettig will continue to be represented in this matter by Attorney Robert Thompson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 03/24/2025. (SLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
11 11 order Scheduling Order Deadline Thu 03/20 11:36 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures on or before April 15, 2025. (2) Motion to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings: Deadline for Plaintiff on or before May 15, 2025; Deadline for Defendants on or before June 1, 2025. (3) Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports: Deadline for Plaintiff on or before October 31, 2025; Deadline for Defendants on or before November 30, 2025. (4) Status Report on or before December 31, 2025. (5) Dispositive or Daubert Motions on or before January 31, 2026. (6) Copies of Memoranda: A courtesy copy of briefs and memoranda in support of motions must be provided to Chambers within 48 hours of electronic filing. Signed by Chief District Judge David L Bunning on 03/20/2025.(SLG)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Thu 03/20 8:40 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review:10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 03/19 3:52 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mando, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
utility Motion Submitted Mon 03/17 10:47 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J Smith for review: re9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Brandon Rettig (WHP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
9 9 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 03/14 3:53 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Brandon Rettig Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Miller-Novak, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order For Meeting and Report Tue 03/04 9:57 AM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of the entry of this Order, the parties, or, if represented by counsel, through their counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses, and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, and to develop a proposed discovery plan. (2) Within ten (10) days after the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: (see a-e). (3) Should the parties find that a joint report is not possible, the parties shall each file individual reports which the Court shall entertain for the purposes of setting out its Scheduling Order or other appropriate Order. Signed by Chief District Judge David L Bunning on 03/04/2025.(SLG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MJ Consent Form
utility File Submitted Tue 03/04 9:04 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review:7 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Newport, Ronald Lalumandier, Ronald Lalumandier. (SLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/03 4:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Newport, Ronald Lalumandier, Ronald Lalumandier.(Mando, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/13 10:56 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandon Rettig. Ronald Lalumandier waiver sent on 1/7/2025, answer due 3/10/2025. (Thompson, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/13 10:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandon Rettig. City of Newport waiver sent on 1/7/2025, answer due 3/10/2025. (Thompson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 12/11 9:24 AM
STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 01/13/2011.(SLG)
Related: [-]
misc Conflict Check Wed 12/11 9:22 AM
Conflict Check run. (SLG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued/Reissued Wed 12/11 9:20 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants and returned to counsel electronically for service.(SLG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons City of Newport
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/11 9:13 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5990326), filed by Brandon Rettig.(SLG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons City of Newport,
Att: 2 Summons Ronald Lalumandier,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet