Maine District Court
Judge:Nancy Torresen
Referred: John C Nivison
Case #: 2:24-cv-00425
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Terminated:Apr 18, 2025
Case in other court:CUMBERLAND COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, PORSCV-24-00337
Last checked: Friday Jan 24, 2025 5:51 AM EST
Defendant
GDI SERVICES INC
Represented By
BROOKE K. HALEY
Preti Flaherty Beliveau & Pachios LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
IVAN TODOROV
Represented By
LISA J. BUTLER
Maine Employee Rights Group Pa LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/18 2:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Parties by IVAN TODOROV. (BUTLER, LISA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
11 11 order Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement Thu 03/27 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on 3/27/25 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 4/28/2025. By DEPUTY CLERK: Stacey Graf. (slg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Wed 01/08 9:56 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting9 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/6/2025. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 6/13/2025. Motions due by 6/27/2025. Ready for Trial on 9/2/2025. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
9 9 motion Amend Scheduling Order Tue 01/07 1:20 PM
JOINT Proposed Discovery and Motion Filing Plan and Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by IVAN TODOROV. (BUTLER, LISA) Modified on 1/7/2025 to change event type to motion (slg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/18 9:53 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/6/2025. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/13/2025. Motions due by 5/27/2025. Ready for Trial on 8/4/2025. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/17 2:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by GDI SERVICES INC.(HALEY, BROOKE)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
6 6 misc Jury Demand Mon 12/16 5:11 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by IVAN TODOROV. (BUTLER, LISA)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Mon 12/16 5:07 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IVAN TODOROV. (BUTLER, LISA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Thu 12/12 3:31 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GDI SERVICES INC. (HALEY, BROOKE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
misc Case Opening Filing Fee Paid Wed 12/11 9:23 AM
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMEDC-3040585.), filed by GDI SERVICES INC.(HALEY, BROOKE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/11 8:49 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc State Court Record Wed 12/11 8:48 AM
STATE COURT RECORD and Declaration of Brooke Haley by GDI SERVICES INC.(cjd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Docket Record,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit C Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D Summons,
Att: 5 Exhibit E Return of Service,
Att: 6 Exhibit F Maine Secretary of State's website,
Att: 7 Exhibit G Plaintiff's earning statements
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 12/11 8:44 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CUMBERLAND COUNTY REGISTRY OF DEEDS, case number PORSCV-2024-337. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by GDI SERVICES INC. (Service of Process Deadline 3/10/2025) Fee due by 12/12/2024.(cjd)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 12/11 8:50 AM
Set Deadlines : Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Disclosure Statement due by 12/17/2024. (cjd)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 12/11 8:51 AM
Set Answer Deadline for GDI Services Inc : Answer due by 12/17/2024. (cjd)
Related: [-]