Trowbridge v. City University of New York et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Analisa Torres |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-09443 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331ed Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 4:49 AM EST |
Defendant
Miguel Cairol
|
|
Defendant
City University of New York
City University of New York 205 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Russell Hotzler
|
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Trowbridge
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
adr
Mediation Conference Scheduled
Wed 04/23 10:49 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 5/22/2025 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni) |
||
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() AMENDED ANSWER to. Document filed by Miguel Cairol, City University of New York, Russell Hotzler..(Siegel, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: 3 days. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 6/26/2025. Fact Discovery due by 6/26/2025. Expert Discovery due by 8/12/2025. Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/25/2025) (vfr) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by City University of New York, Russell Hotzler, Miguel Cairol..(Siegel, Jonathan) |
|
14 | 14
![]() JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jonathan A. Siegel dated February 24, 2025 re: Joint letter per PTSO. Document filed by City University of New York, Russell Hotzler, Miguel Cairol..(Siegel, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
adr
Notice of Mediator Assignment
Tue 02/18 9:23 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 3/20/2025.(sge) |
||
Monday, February 03, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/18/2025. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by City University of New York, Russell Hotzler, Miguel Cairol..(Siegel, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Miguel Cairol served on 12/19/2024, answer due 1/31/2025. Service was accepted by Katherine Raymond, Counsel. Document filed by Stephen Trowbridge..(Bagley, James) |
|
10 | 10
![]() AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Russell Hotzler served on 12/19/2024, answer due 1/31/2025. Service was accepted by Katherine Raymond, Counsel. Document filed by Stephen Trowbridge..(Bagley, James) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne L. Clark on behalf of Stephen Trowbridge..(Clark, Anne) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Bagley on behalf of Stephen Trowbridge..(Bagley, James) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by February 24, 2025, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/16/2024) (ar) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ORDER To protect the public health, while promoting the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, video conference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b) (5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28 if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/16/2024) (ar) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ORDER To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by February 24, 2025, file a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, on the docket. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by February 24, 2025, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/16/2024) (ar) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ORDER granting3 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Miguel Cairol answer due 1/31/2025; City University of New York answer due 1/31/2025; Russell Hotzler answer due 1/31/2025. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/16/2024) (rro) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jonathan A. Siegel dated December 13, 2024. Document filed by City University of New York..(Siegel, Jonathan) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2024 | ||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 12/12 12:50 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 12/12 12:51 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 12/12 12:51 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, December 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Siegel, Jonathan) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 160134/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30315075).Document filed by City University of New York..(Siegel, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |