New York Southern District Court
Judge:Naomi Reice Buchwald
Case #: 1:24-cv-09458
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024
Terminated:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 4:52 AM EST
Defendant
Susan Dibbins
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Plaintiff
Maninder Singh
Represented By
Genet Getachew
Law Office Of Genet Getachew
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 03/18 5:27 PM
ORDER... WHEREAS plaintiff filed a complaint on December 13, 2024, and WHEREAS we have informed plaintiff's counsel by letter, dated February 12, 2025, of plaintiff's obligation to effect service within 90 days of filing (see Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m)), and WHEREAS plaintiff has not filed an affidavit of service with respect to any defendant; it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/18/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
6 6 order Endorsed Letter Wed 02/12 10:57 AM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Counsel from Naomi Reice Buchwald United States District Judge dated 2/12/2025 re: Singh v. Mayorkas et. al.,. ENDORSEMENT: A review of the docket sheet in the above-captioned matter indicates that your complaint was filed on December 13, 2024, and that, as of today's date, the complaint has not been served on the defendants. Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as amended as of January 1, 2018, provides: If a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the court on motion or on its own after notice to the plaintiff must dismiss the action without prejudice against that defendant or order that service be made within a specified time. But if the plaintiff shows good cause for the failure, the court must extend the time for service for an appropriate period. Thus, unless you achieve service or can show good cause why your time to serve should be extended, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice on March 13, 2025. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/12/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/07 4:20 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Genet Getachew to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official Standard A.O. Summons form dated 06/12. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/06 5:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, et al, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Maninder Singh..(Getachew, Genet)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/06 3:14 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Genet Getachew to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the party names whom summons is for must be listed on the docket text.;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/05 3:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, et al, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Maninder Singh..(Getachew, Genet)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/05 2:37 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Genet Getachew to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; do not use the Freedom of Information Act form; party name listed on the ECF docket text and the PDF 'To' field must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/04 10:48 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alegandrro Matorkas, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Maninder Singh..(Getachew, Genet)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 01/07 3:25 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Genet Getachew to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name contains a typo. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 01/06 5:55 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alegandrro Matorkas, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Maninder Singh..(Getachew, Genet)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
misc Case Opening Fee Paid via Pay.gov Mon 12/16 11:03 AM
Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 405.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-30317858, paid on 12/11/2024..(gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 12/16 11:06 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Genet Getachew. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: ALL PARTIES - party role was entered incorrectly and ALL DEFENDANTS - party text was omitted. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 12/16 11:07 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Genet Getachew to RE-FILE re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF (MISSING PARTY NAME ON THE DOCKET) AND the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/16 11:10 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Genet Getachew. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 12/16 11:11 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 12/16 11:11 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 12/16 11:14 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/13 9:30 AM
COMPLAINT against SUSAN DIBBINS, UR M. JADDOU, Alegandro Mayorkas. Document filed by Maninder Singh..(Getachew, Genet)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney to File Initial Pleading Thu 12/12 3:27 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Genet Getachew to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 12/17/2024. (gp)
Related: [-]