Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-45180

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jil Mazer-Marino
Case #: 1:24-bk-45181
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Jus Punjabi LLC
3601 36th Ave Ste 4
Long Island City, NY 11106-1348
Represented By
Leo Fox, Esq.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Fri 03/21 3:26 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Leo Fox Representing Debtor, Jeremy Sussman from the Office of the United States Trustee - Status hearing to be held on 05/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (tml)
Related: [-] 4 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Monday, March 17, 2025
28 28 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 03/17 5:07 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-45181 for the Month Ending: February 1-28, 2025 Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Fri 02/21 7:58 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; - Status hearing to be held on 03/19/2025 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (jag)
Related: [-] 4 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
27 27 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) Wed 02/12 3:09 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (No Fee) Wed 02/12 3:08 PM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule E/F, : Schedule E-F Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
25 25 notice Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment (use to correct date, time or location of a presentment / heari Thu 02/06 5:01 PM
Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment To Set the Last Day to File Proof of Claim . Objections to be filed on 02/16/2025. Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC Related [+] (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim filed by Debtor Jus Punjabi LLC
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
24 24 motion Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Wed 02/05 6:51 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC. (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Tue 02/11 9:15 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Leo Fox Representing Debtor, David Abrams Representing Saim Naqvi, Shannon Scott from the Office of the United States Trustee - Status hearing to be held on 02/19/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (tml)
Related: [-] 4 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
23 23 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 02/04 6:20 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-45181 for the Month Ending: 12/31/2024 Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
22 22 misc Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Fri 01/31 2:48 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Corrected Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC (Fox, Esq., Leo). Related [+] Modified on 1/31/2025 to add linkage (jag)
Related: [-] 20 Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) filed by Debtor Jus Punjabi LLC.
Friday, January 17, 2025
21 21 misc Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Stat Information (Form 106Sum) Fri 01/17 9:55 AM
DOCUMENT NOT FLATTEN Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information (Form 106Sum) for Individuals Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC Related [+] (Fox, Esq., Leo) Modified on 1/17/2025 (jag)
Related: [-] 3 Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Thursday, January 16, 2025
20 20 misc Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Thu 01/16 3:52 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC Related [+] (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-] 3 Deficient Filing Chapter 11
19 19 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) Thu 01/16 3:51 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC Related [+] (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-] 3 Deficient Filing Chapter 11
18 18 misc Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals (Form 206Sum) Thu 01/16 3:50 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals (Form 206Sum) for Non-Individuals Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (No Fee) Thu 01/16 3:49 PM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, : Schedules Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summary of Schedules
Saturday, December 21, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Sun 12/22 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Notice Date 12/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
15 15 order Joint Administration Thu 12/19 10:52 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case: 24-45180 (JMM) with Member Cases: 24-45181 (JMM); 24-45182 (JMM) Related [+] Signed on 12/19/2024. (rom)
Related: [-] 2
court Entry Thu 12/19 10:55 AM
An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration for procedural consolidation purposes only of the Chapter 11 cases of Jus Broadcasting Corporation (Case No. 24-45180 ; Jus Punjabi LLC (Case No. 24-45181 and Jus One Corp. (Case No. 24-45182 , and the Chapter 11 case of Jus Broadcasting Corporation (Case No. 24-45180 should be hereinafter consulted for all matters affecting this case. (rom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 12/19 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 12/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Verification of List of Creditors Wed 12/18 10:02 AM
Verification of List of Creditors Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
12 12 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Mon 12/16 10:15 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/17/2025 at 10:45 AM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 929-2553, Participant Code 1576337, Enter # sign. (Khodorovsky, Nazar)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 14, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Sun 12/15 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Sun 12/15 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Fri 12/13 4:59 PM
Letter Re: Proposed Order Approving Joint Administration Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC Related [+] (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Jus Punjabi LLC
8 8 misc Affidavit Fri 12/13 2:04 PM
Affidavit Re: Rule 1007-4 Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC Related [+] (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-] 7 Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (No Fee) filed by Debtor Jus Punjabi LLC
Thursday, December 12, 2024
7 7 misc Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (No Fee) Thu 12/12 5:04 PM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) : Rule 1007 Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Refiled Petition Re: Forms Modernization 2015 (Pgs 1-4) for Non-Individuals Thu 12/12 4:56 PM
Refiled Petition Re: Forms Modernization 2015 (Pgs 1-4)for Non-Individuals; Debtor is not a small business debtor and will not proceed under Sub-Chapter V of Chapter 11 Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC Related [+] (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Jus Punjabi LLC
5 5 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 12/12 2:45 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Jus Punjabi LLC. Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Thu 12/12 12:25 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 12/12/2024 Status hearing to be held on 2/5/2025 at 11:45 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (tml)
Related: [-]
court Case Related to a Chapter 11 Thu 12/12 8:57 AM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 24-45180 jmm: Jus Broadcasting Corporation 24-45182 jmm: Jus One Corp. (nwh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
3 3 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Thu 12/12 9:28 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11Mailing Matrix / List of Creditors Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-3 due by 12/11/2024. Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 12/11/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 12/11/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 12/11/2024. Small Business Balance Sheet due by 12/18/2024. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due by 12/18/2024. Small Business Statement of Operations due by 12/18/2024. Small Business Tax Return due by 12/18/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 12/26/2024. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information Official Form 106Sum due by 12/26/2024. Schedule A/B due 12/26/2024. Schedule D due 12/26/2024. Schedule E/F due 12/26/2024. Schedule G due 12/26/2024. Schedule H due 12/26/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 12/26/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 12/26/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 12/26/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 12/26/2024. (jag)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration Wed 12/11 8:20 PM
Motion for Joint Administration with Case(s) Jus Broadcasting Corporation and Jus One Corp. Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC. (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 12/11 7:44 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Small Business Non-Individual Subchapter V. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus Punjabi LLC Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 03/11/2025. (Fox, Esq., Leo)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Wed 12/11 7:44 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 24-45181 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23181823. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
utility Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadlines Fri 12/13 9:33 AM
Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Updated Chapter 11 Plan due by 4/10/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 4/10/2025. (jag)
Related: [-]