Jus One Corp.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-45180
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-45180
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jil Mazer-Marino |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-45182 |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Jus One Corp.
3601 36th Ave Ste 4
Long Island City, NY 11106-1348 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 19, 2025 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK)
Fri 03/21 3:27 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Leo Fox Representing Debtor, Jeremy Sussman from the Office of the United States Trustee - Status hearing to be held on 05/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (tml) |
||
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-45182 for the Month Ending: February 1-28, 2025 Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2025 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK)
Fri 02/21 7:59 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; - Status hearing to be held on 03/19/2025 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (jag) |
||
Wednesday, February 12, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule E/F, : Schedule E-F Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2025 | ||
utility
Update Presentment Deadlines
Thu 02/06 9:39 AM
Presentment Deadline Updated Objections to be filed on February 16, 2025. Hearing on Objections, if any, February 19, 2025. Order to be presented for signature on 2/19/2025. (one) |
||
Wednesday, February 05, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp.. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK)
Tue 02/11 9:16 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Leo Fox Representing Debtor, David Abrams Representing Saim Naqvi, Shannon Scott from the Office of the United States Trustee - Status hearing to be held on 02/19/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (tml) |
||
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-45182 for the Month Ending: 12/31/2024 Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Corrected Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information (Form 106Sum) for Individuals Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals (Form 206Sum) for Non-Individuals Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, : Schedules Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Saturday, December 21, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Notice Date 12/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case: 24-45180 (JMM) with Member Cases: 24-45181 JMM) ; 24-45182 (JMM) Signed on 12/19/2024. (rom) |
|
court
Entry
Thu 12/19 10:56 AM
An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration for procedural consolidation purposes only of the Chapter 11 cases of Jus Broadcasting Corporation (Case No. 24-45180 ; Jus Punjabi LLC (Case No. 24-45181 and Jus One Corp. (Case No. 24-45182 , and the Chapter 11 case of Jus Broadcasting Corporation (Case No. 24-45180 should be hereinafter consulted for all matters affecting this case. (rom) |
||
Wednesday, December 18, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 12/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Verification of List of Creditors Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee
Mon 12/16 10:16 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/17/2025 at 10:45 AM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 929-2553, Participant Code 1576337, Enter # sign. (Khodorovsky, Nazar) |
|
Saturday, December 14, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Letter Re: Proposed Order Approving Joint Administration Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Affidavit Re: Rule 1007-4 Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
utility
Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadlines
Fri 12/13 12:05 PM
Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Updated Chapter 11 Plan due by 4/10/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 4/10/2025. (one) |
||
Thursday, December 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) : Rule 1007 Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Refiled Petition Re: Forms Modernization 2015 (Pgs 1-4)for Non-Individuals; Debtor is not a small business debtor and will not proceed under Sub-Chapter V of Chapter 11 Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Jus One Corp.. Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 12/12/2024 Status hearing to be held on 2/5/2025 at 11:45 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (tml) |
|
court
Case Related to a Chapter 11
Thu 12/12 9:00 AM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 24-45180 jmm: Jus Broadcasting Corporation, 24-45181 jmm: Jus Punjabi LLC (nwh) |
||
utility
Judge Reassignment Utility
Thu 12/12 9:01 AM
Judge Nancy Hershey Lord removed from the case due to Related Case, Judge Reassigned. Judge Jil Mazer-Marino added to the case. (nwh) |
||
Wednesday, December 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Deficient Filing Chapter 11Mailing Matrix / List of Creditors Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-3 due by 12/11/2024. Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 12/11/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 12/11/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 12/11/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 12/11/2024. Subchapter V Balance Sheet due by 12/18/2024. Subchapter V Cash Flow Statement due by 12/18/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 12/26/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 12/26/2024. Schedule A/B due 12/26/2024. Schedule D due 12/26/2024. Schedule E/F due 12/26/2024. Schedule G due 12/26/2024. Schedule H due 12/26/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 12/26/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 12/26/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 12/26/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 12/26/2024. (one) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration with Case(s) Jus Broadcasting Corporation and Jus Punjabi LLC Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp.. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Small Business Non-Individual Subchapter V. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Leo Fox, Esq. on behalf of Jus One Corp. Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 03/11/2025. (Fox, Esq., Leo) |
|
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Wed 12/11 7:51 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 24-45182 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23181826. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |