Michigan Western District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00516
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Terminated:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 12, 2024 2:21 AM EST
plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Richard Clayton Stiffler
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
defendant
David Helman (1)
Terminated: 12/10/2024
Represented By
Nicholas Voss Dondzila
Dondzila Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/12/2024 4:17 AM EST
Sunday, December 08, 2024
WARRANT EXECUTED; defendant David Helman arrested by Three Rivers Police Department agent Unknown in Three Rivers, MI (USM Control Room, mac)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
CASE UNSEALED as to David Helman pursuant to defendant's arrest (bjg)
Related: [-]
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as counsel for defendant David Helman; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
Related: [-]
Federal Public Defender recommends that Nicholas Voss Dondzila be appointed to represent defendant David Helman (Federal Public Defender, )
Related: [-]
CJA 20 APPOINTMENT of Nicholas Voss Dondzila for defendant David Helman; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (bjg)
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs MINUTES of FIRST APPEARANCE in Rule 5 proceedings for defendant David Helman held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; Attorney Nicholas Dondzila appeared on defendant's behalf; defendant waived identity hearing and production of the warrant; defendant released on $10,000 unsecured bond; Order to Appear in charging district to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (bjg)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs WAIVER of Rule 5 and 5.1 hearings by David Helman (bjg)
Related: [-]
3 3 4 pgs BOND and ORDER setting conditions of release as to defendant David Helman on a unsecured $10,000 bond (copy provided to defendant); signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (bjg)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs ORDER requiring defendant David Helman to appear in the Western District of North Carolina where charges are pending; any bail deposited in the registry of this court should be transferred by the clerk to the Western District of North Carolina; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (bjg)
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 financial affidavit by defendant David Helman in support of request for court-appointed counsel [Constantine] (bjg)
Related: [-]