Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00584
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 12, 2024 1:47 AM CST
Defendant
Victoria Christine Flores (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Christopher Atkinson Jenkins
Federal Public Defenders
contact info
Material Witness
Jose Adalberto Diaz-Perez
Represented By
Jeanette Cantu-Bazar
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Anthony Jafeth Macias-Cruz
Represented By
Jeanette Cantu-Bazar
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Liesel LeCates Roscher
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Corpus Christi MagDuty
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/12/2024 3:40 AM CST
Sunday, December 08, 2024
Arrest of Victoria Christine Flores. (jdr2)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Victoria Christine Flores (1), filed. (Brooks) Initial Appearance set for 12/10/2024 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock (ms2)
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Anthony Jafeth Macias-Cruz, Jose Adalberto Diaz-Perez as to Victoria Christine Flores. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 12/10/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock, filed. (ms2)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (jdr2)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Jose Adalberto Diaz-Perez, Anthony Jafeth Macias-Cruz. Jeanette Cantu-Bazar appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (jdr2)
Related: [-]