Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-04924
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 12, 2024 1:35 AM CST
Defendant
Juan Carlos Ramirez-Mendoza (1)
Represented By
Erik Anthony Hanshew
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/12/2024 3:32 AM CST
Saturday, December 07, 2024
Arrest of Juan Carlos Ramirez-Mendoza (mao)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to Juan Carlos Ramirez-Mendoza. (mao)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Juan Carlos Ramirez-Mendoza. (mao)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mao)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Juan Carlos Ramirez-Mendoza held on 12/9/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Juan Carlos Ramirez-Mendoza (Court Reporter ERO.) (mao)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Juan Carlos Ramirez-Mendoza. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mao)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Juan Carlos Ramirez-Mendoza, ( Detention Hearing set for 12/18/2024 02:30 PM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,, Preliminary Hearing set for 12/18/2024 02:30 PM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Juan Carlos Ramirez-Mendoza. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mao)
Related: [-]