Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-01534
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 12, 2024 1:36 AM CST
Defendant
Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo (1)
Represented By
Victor Luis Villafranca
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Roberto Carlos Martinez Hernandez
Represented By
Emilio Davila, Jr.
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Manuel Arnoldo Cardenas, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/12/2024 3:20 AM CST
Thursday, November 14, 2024
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 11/15/2024 at 09:33 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (akp5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo, filed. (akp5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Roberto Carlos Martinez Hernandez as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 11/15/2024 at 09:33 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos, filed. (akp5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
4 4 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on November 14, 2024 at 11:19 AM as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (akp5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo. Attorney Victor Luis Villafranca for Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo added. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo held on 11/15/2024. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. Defendant submitted written waiver of Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing to the Court. Termination of applicable hearings will follow accordingly. Appearances: Tae Chon AUSA; USPO: Brenda Garza ; USM: Deputy Alexis Aguero. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:30 AM - 9:50 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Janis Palma, used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS Roberto Carlos Martinez Hernandez as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 11/15/2024. Material Witness advised that no charges are pending and that Material Witness is detained in case. Financial Affidavit executed. Material Witness requests appointed counsel. Private Attorney appointed. Next on list: Emilio Davila. Order of Detention Pending Trial. Material Witness orally waives detention hearing. Material Witness requested a letter to be sent to consulate of Mexico. All parties appeared in person. Material witnesses sworn in. Material witness submitted written waiver of Detention hearing to the Court. Appearances: Tae Chon, AUSA; Emilio Davila f/Material Witness. (Tape #10:03 AM - 10:06 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia ) (DUSM: Deputy Alexis Aguero) (Interpreter: Janis Palma /used) (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
**Terminate Detention Hearing as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo: Material Witness orally waived on 11/15/2024 before the Court. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo: Prelim Exam and Detention Hrg terminated. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
5 5 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo, filed. Agent: Adrian Davila (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER on Material Witness Affidavit. The material witness(es) are committed to the custody of the U.S. Marshal's Service pending a detention hearing. Agent: Adrian Davila (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo, filed. (mtl5). [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo. Victor Villafranca appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
9 9 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
11 11 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo. Detention Hearing set for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
12 12 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Material Witness Roberto Carlos Martinez Hernandez as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo, filed. (mtl5). [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Roberto Carlos Martinez Hernandez. Emilio Davila appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
14 14 Letter sent to Consulate General of Mexico re Roberto Carlos Martinez Hernandez, Material Witness in case as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo, filed. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS Roberto Carlos Martinez Hernandez to the custody of the United States Marshal. Detention Hearing set for 11/22/2024 at 10:01 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS Roberto Carlos Martinez Hernandez to the custody of the United States Marshal. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
17 17 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo, filed. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
18 18 WAIVER of Detention Hearing in the case of Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo, filed. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
19 19 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Material Witness Roberto Carlos Martinez Hernandez in the case of Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo, filed. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
20 20 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Manuel Arnoldo Cardenas, Jr appearing for USA, filed. (Cardenas, Manuel) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 01, 2024
21 21 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (jb5) [5:24-mj-01643]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
22 22 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo (1) count(s) 1, 2, filed. (egg5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
23 23 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Cesar Ulises Luna Castillo. Arraignment set for 12/19/2024 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/30/2024. Notification of Intent to Proceed to Trial due by 1/30/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos Notification Regarding Material Witnesses due by 12/30/2024 (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified. (egg5)
Related: [-]