California Northern District Court
Judge:Lisa J Cisneros
Case #: 3:24-cv-08891
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 24, 2025 2:28 AM PST
Defendant
Duracell Power Center, LLC
Plaintiff
CyboEnergy, Inc.
Represented By
William Peterson Ramey, III
Ramey LLP
contact info
Jennifer L. Ishimoto
Jennifer Ishimoto
contact info

GPO Dec 12 2024
ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for William P. Ramey. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2024)
GPO Mar 06 2025
***DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED FILING AT DOCKET #15.*** ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 13 Motion to Continue CMC. Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2025 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2025) Modified on 3/7/2025 (jml, COURT STAFF).

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
16 16 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/12 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CyboEnergy, Inc. (Ishimoto, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/07 2:38 PM
ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 13 Motion to Continue CMC. Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2025 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 03/06 3:40 PM
ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 13 Motion to Continue CMC. Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2025 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Continue Thu 03/06 12:41 PM
MOTION to Continue CMC (with accompanying Declaration) filed by CyboEnergy, Inc..(Ishimoto, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 01/10 7:59 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CyboEnergy, Inc... (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 12/27 8:07 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 1/10/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/12 3:15 PM
ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for William P. Ramey. (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/12 8:47 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number 05751G.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/12/2024 filed by CyboEnergy, Inc.. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/12 8:39 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20135452.) filed by CyboEnergy, Inc.. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 12/11 11:24 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 12/11 11:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Duracell Power Center, LLC. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 12/11 10:12 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/26/2024. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 12/11 10:52 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. Re:4 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by CyboEnergy, Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
4 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by CyboEnergy, Inc. (Ishimoto, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
3 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patents (cc: form mailed to register). (Ishimoto, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Ishimoto, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against Duracell Power Center, LLC with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20125503.). Filed by CyboEnergy, Inc..(Ishimoto, Jennifer) Modified on 12/11/2024 (jml, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet