California Southern District Court
Judge:Robert S Huie
Referred: Michelle M Pettit
Case #: 3:24-cv-02300
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 3:01 AM PST
Counter Claimant
TomoCredit, Inc.
Represented By
Hazel Mae Pangan
Gordon And Rees LLP
contact info
Susan B Meyer
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Prism Data Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Eleanor M. Lackman
Mitchell, Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant
TomoCredit, Inc.
Represented By
Hazel Mae Pangan
Gordon And Rees LLP
contact info
Susan B Meyer
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Michael K. Friedland
Friedland Cianfrani LLP
contact info
Nicole A. Rossi Townes
Friedland Cianfrani LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Prism Data Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Eleanor M. Lackman
Mitchell, Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
24 24 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 05/02 4:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER : Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Continue ENE, which Defendant opposes. ECF Nos. 22, 23. For the reasons stated below, Plaintiff's Motion to Continue ENE is DENIED in part. The Court GRANTS a limited continuance of some ENE-related deadlines (as described below), but the Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion to the extent that it requests to continue the ENE. The purpose of an ENE is to reduce expense and delay in a case. Local Civil Rule 16.1.c. This case has been pending for five months. As a secondary consideration, Plaintiff's requests to continue ENE-related deadlines is untimely in violation of Chambers Rule VIII. The parties should have met and conferred two weeks ago. ECF No. 9. Plaintiff also missed its deadline to lodge its confidential ENE brief. ECF No. 9. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to lodge its confidential ENE brief in accordance with the Court's Notice and Order for ENE on or before May 6, 2025 . ECF No. 9. To the extent the parties have not met and conferred as required, the parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer on or before May 5, 2025 . To the extent the parties have not exchanged initial disclosures as required, the parties are DIRECTED to do so on or before May 8, 2025 . The parties are further DIRECTED to file their joint discovery plan on or before May 8, 2025 . IT IS SO ORDERED by the Honorable Michelle M. Pettit on May 2, 2025. (no document attached) (lah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/01 3:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION to Continue filed by TomoCredit, Inc.. (Pangan, Hazel)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Continue Thu 05/01 10:49 AM
MOTION to Continue by Prism Data Technologies, Inc..(Lackman, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Email Correspondence
Thursday, April 24, 2025
21 21 motion Dismiss Thu 04/24 3:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and Strike Defendant's Amended Affirmative Defenses by Prism Data Technologies, Inc..(Lackman, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/16 11:00 AM
ORDER Granting Motion For Extension Of Time To File Response To Counterlcaim [Ecf No.19 ]. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 04/16/2025. (stn)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/16 8:07 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Prism Data Technologies, Inc..(Lackman, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion to Strike Tue 04/15 3:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER by the Hon. Robert S. Huie: Defendant filed an Amended Answer and Counterclaim as of right pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1). ECF No.17 . In light of this amended pleading, Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and Strike the original pleading [ECF No.15 ] is denied as moot and without prejudice. (no document attached) (stn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
17 17 22 pgs cmp Counterclaim Amended Answer to Complaint Thu 04/03 11:53 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Prism Data Technologies, Inc. by TomoCredit, Inc..(Meyer, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redline Version of Defendant and CounterClaimant First Amended Answer and Counterclaim
Friday, March 14, 2025
16 16 notice Request for Judicial Notice Fri 03/14 5:11 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Prism Data Technologies, Inc. re15 MOTION to Strike6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim ECF 6 ,6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Lackman, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Strike Fri 03/14 5:10 PM
MOTION to Strike6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim ECF 6 by Prism Data Technologies, Inc.. (Lackman, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/07 9:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER By District Judge Robert S. Huie: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time [ECF No.13 ]. Plaintiff shall file a responsive pleading by March 14, 2025. (no document attached) (stn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/06 2:40 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Prism Data Technologies, Inc..(Lackman, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Susan B Meyer on behalf of TomoCredit, Inc. (Meyer, Susan)Attorney Susan B Meyer added to party TomoCredit, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Susan B Meyer added to party TomoCredit, Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/25 2:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert S. Huie: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Answer with Counterclaim [ECF No.10 ]. Plaintiff's response is due no later than March 10, 2025. (no document attached) (stn)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/25 9:42 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Prism Data Technologies, Inc..(Lackman, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Friday, February 14, 2025
9 9 10 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Fri 02/14 1:43 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 02/14/2025.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/12 9:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Friedland on behalf of TomoCredit, Inc. (Friedland, Michael)Attorney Michael K. Friedland added to party TomoCredit, Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/12 9:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole A. Rossi Townes on behalf of TomoCredit, Inc. (Rossi Townes, Nicole)Attorney Nicole A. Rossi Townes added to party TomoCredit, Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 02/10 12:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Prism Data Technologies, Inc. by TomoCredit, Inc..(Pangan, Hazel)Attorney Hazel Mae Pangan added to party TomoCredit, Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
5 5 service Request for Waiver of Service Tue 12/17 9:24 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to TomoCredit, Inc. on 12/16/24 by Prism Data Technologies, Inc.. (Lackman, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 12/11 11:33 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axi)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM Wed 12/11 11:22 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *7,149,656* cc:USPTO (axi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Wed 12/11 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Prism Data Technologies, Inc. No Parties With Financial Interest. (axi)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/11 11:15 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against TomoCredit, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19421005.), filed by Prism Data Technologies, Inc. The new case number is 3:24-cv-2300-RSH-MMP. Judge Robert S. Huie and Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit are assigned to the case. (Lackman, Eleanor)(axi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet