Original Case: 5:22-cv-05249

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-03491
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 12, 2024 2:16 AM CST
Defendant
Deputy Adam Baker
Defendant
Deputy Bryan Cooper
Defendant
Deputy Cedric Lampkin
Defendant
Deputy Jack Simpson
Defendant
Deputy Brittany Wright
Defendant
Deputy Michael White
Defendant
Deputy Logan Cornelison
Defendant
Deputy Jordin Beard
Defendant
Deputy Davis Golden
Defendant
Deputy Shannon Monday
Defendant
Deputy David Fischer
Defendant
Benton County, Arkansas
Defendant
Sheriff Shawn Holloway
Defendant
MPO Samuel Mosley
Defendant
Corporal Benjamin Vinson, Jr., In his official and individual capacities
Defendant - Appellant
Deputy Joshua Loya
Represented By
Jason E. Owens
JASON OWENS LAW FIRM
contact info
Daniel Knox Faulkner
JASON OWENS LAW FIRM
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Sergeant Levi Franks, In his official and individual capacities
Represented By
Jason E. Owens
JASON OWENS LAW FIRM
contact info
Daniel Knox Faulkner
JASON OWENS LAW FIRM
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Deputy Reeve Koehler, In his official and individual capacities
Represented By
Jason E. Owens
JASON OWENS LAW FIRM
contact info
Daniel Knox Faulkner
JASON OWENS LAW FIRM
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Deputy Landon Wilkins, In his official and individual capacities
Represented By
Jason E. Owens
JASON OWENS LAW FIRM
contact info
Daniel Knox Faulkner
JASON OWENS LAW FIRM
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Bradley R. Bolin
Represented By
Alicia Canfield
MILLER & BUTLER
contact info
John E. Baureis
MILLER & BUTLER
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/12/2024 2:16 AM CST
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [5464711] 24-3491 (RDB)
Related: [-]
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 12/5/2024 [5464717] 24-3491 (RDB)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Transcript due on or before 01/21/2025. Appendix due 01/29/2025. BRIEF APPELLANT, Levi Franks, Reeve Koehler, Joshua Loya and Landon Wilkins due 01/29/2025
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5464722] 24-3491 (RDB)
Related: [-]