Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-10217

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 1:24-bk-10218
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company
4695 S 14th St
Abilene, TX 79605-4734
Represented By
Joseph F Postnikoff
Rochelle Mccullough, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Sunday, May 11, 2025
37 37 misc Operating report Sun 05/11 2:41 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2025 filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
36 36 misc Operating report Mon 04/21 4:57 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2025 filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
35 35 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Wed 04/16 11:21 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 40. Notice Date 04/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Order reassigning case - Judge Robert L Jones terminated. Judge Edward L. Morris assigned. Entered on 4/14/2025
Monday, April 14, 2025
34 34 order Reassigning case Mon 04/14 4:30 PM
Order reassigning case - Judge Robert L Jones terminated. Judge Edward L. Morris assigned. Entered on 4/14/2025 (Tello, Chris)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
33 33 misc Operating report Mon 03/24 8:33 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2025 filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
32 32 misc Operating report Mon 02/24 12:07 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 2025 filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Mon 02/10 11:42 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice for Copies of All Orders, Notices, Proposed Orders, and Pleadings by Shane Bebout filed by Creditor Warren Power & Machinery, Inc. d/b/a Warren CAT. (Bebout, Shane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
30 30 misc Operating report Tue 01/21 8:54 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period December 2024 filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
29 29 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 01/17 11:22 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order granting application to employ Rochelle McCullough LLP as Attorney (related document7 ) Entered on 1/15/2025.
28 28 misc Operating report Fri 01/17 10:07 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period December 2024 filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-]
court Meeting of creditors held Fri 01/17 2:08 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 1/17/2025 Related [+] (Schmidt, Erin)
Related: [-] 11 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
27 27 order Employ Wed 01/15 4:08 PM
Order granting application to employ Rochelle McCullough LLP as Attorney Related [+] Entered on 1/15/2025. (Hyden, Kara)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, January 13, 2025
26 26 misc Certificate of no objection Mon 01/13 9:57 AM
Certificate of no objection filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company Related [+]. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-] 7 Application to employ Rochelle McCullough, LLP as Attorney
Monday, December 30, 2024
24 24 misc Statement of financial affairs Mon 12/30 3:45 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company Related [+]. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
23 23 misc Schedules Mon 12/30 3:44 PM
Schedules: Schedules A-B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company Related [+]. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
Friday, December 27, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order (generic) Fri 12/27 11:59 AM
Order granting debtor's motion to extend time to file schedules and statements of financial affairs. All deficiencies extended through 12/31/2024. Related [+]. Entered on 12/27/2024 (Hyden, Kara)
Related: [-] ferences motion #31 in Lead Case 24-10217
Friday, December 20, 2024
21 21 order Joint administration Fri 12/20 10:22 AM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 1:24-bk-10217 with member case 1:2024-bk-10218-rlj Related [+]. ORDERED, that all orders, pleadings, papers and documents, except proofs of claim, lists, schedules, statements and monthly operation reports, shall be filed and docketed in the LEAD case, number 24-10217 Entered on 12/20/2024. (Hyden, Kara)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, December 19, 2024
20 20 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 12/19 11:25 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order granting motion for expedited hearing (Related Doc9 )(document set for hearing:8 Motion for joint administration) Hearing to be held on 12/19/2024 at 03:00 PM via WebEx for8 , Entered on 12/17/2024.
19 19 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Thu 12/19 11:25 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/17/2025 at 01:30 PM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 2/20/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/10/2025.
18 18 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Thu 12/19 1:49 PM
Amended Witness and Exhibit List filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company Related [+]. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-] 13 List (witness/exhibit/generic)
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
17 17 notice Notice (generic) Thu 12/19 1:19 PM
Notice Notice of Filing of (I) Cash Flow Statement, (II) Statement of Operations, and (III) Balance Sheet filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company Related [+]. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 12/26/2024. Schedule D due 12/26/2024. Schedule E/F due 12/26/2024. Schedule G due 12/26/2024. Schedule H due 12/26/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 12/26/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 12/26/2024. Declaration for electronic filing due within 7 days of filing the petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/26/2024. Cash Flow Statement due 12/19/2024. Chapter 11 Small Business Balance Sheet due 12/19/2024. Chapter 11 Small Business Statement of Operations due 12/19/2024.
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
16 16 trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Wed 12/18 9:23 AM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee . Areya Holder Aurzada (SBRA V) added to the case. (Schmidt, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
15 15 order Expedite hearing Tue 12/17 5:09 PM
Order granting motion for expedited hearing Related [+](document set for hearing:8 Motion for joint administration) Hearing to be held on 12/19/2024 at 03:00 PM via WebEx for8 , Entered on 12/17/2024. (Hyden, Kara)
Related: [-] #9
14 14 misc Certificate of service Tue 12/17 2:38 PM
Certificate of service re: Notice of Expedited Hearings and Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company Related [+]. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-] 11 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11,12 Notice of hearing
Att: 1 Service List
13 13 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Tue 12/17 2:35 PM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company Related [+]. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for joint administration of cases 24-10217 RLJ11 and 24-10218 RLJ11
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 4
Att: 4 Exhibit 5
Att: 5 Exhibit 6
Att: 6 Exhibit 8
Att: 7 Exhibit 9
Att: 8 Exhibit 10
12 12 notice Notice of hearing Tue 12/17 2:23 PM
Notice of hearing Notice of Expedited Hearings on (1) Motion for Joint Administration; (2) Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral; (B) Granting Adequate Protection; and (C) Scheduling a Final Hearing; and (3) Motion for Authority to Satisfy Prepetition Wage and Associated Withholding Claims filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 12/19/2024 at 03:00 PM Abilene Video for8 , (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for joint administration of cases 24-10217 RLJ11 and 24-10218 RLJ11 Filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company (Attachments: # 1 Service List)
Monday, December 16, 2024
11 11 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Mon 12/16 7:59 AM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/17/2025 at 01:30 PM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 2/20/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/10/2025. (Schmidt, Erin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 14, 2024
10 10 court BNC certificate of mailing Sat 12/14 11:20 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 12/26/2024. Schedule D due 12/26/2024. Schedule E/F due 12/26/2024. Schedule G due 12/26/2024. Schedule H due 12/26/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 12/26/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 12/26/2024. Declaration for electronic filing due within 7 days of filing the petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/26/2024. Cash Flow Statement due 12/19/2024. Chapter 11 Small Business Balance Sheet due 12/19/2024. Chapter 11 Small Business Statement of Operations due 12/19/2024.
Friday, December 13, 2024
9 9 motion Expedite hearing Fri 12/13 4:41 PM
Motion for expedited hearin Related [+] Filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for joint administration
8 8 motion Joint administration Fri 12/13 4:25 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases 24-10217 RLJ11 and 24-10218 RLJ11 Filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Service List
7 7 motion Employ Fri 12/13 4:19 PM
Application to employ Rochelle McCullough, LLP as Attorney Filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Service List
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 misc Matrix Thu 12/12 2:15 PM
Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Notice of deficiency Thu 12/12 9:05 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 12/26/2024. Schedule D due 12/26/2024. Schedule E/F due 12/26/2024. Schedule G due 12/26/2024. Schedule H due 12/26/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 12/26/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 12/26/2024. Declaration for electronic filing due within 7 days of filing the petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/26/2024. Cash Flow Statement due 12/19/2024. Chapter 11 Small Business Balance Sheet due 12/19/2024. Chapter 11 Small Business Statement of Operations due 12/19/2024. (Dozier, Bryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of corporate ownership Thu 12/12 8:11 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. filed by Debtor Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 (case upload) Thu 12/12 6:06 AM
Non-Individual Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 - case upload. filed by Joseph F Postnikoff of Rochelle McCullough, LLP on behalf of Primal Crushing, LLC, a Texas limited liability company. (Postnikoff, Joseph)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 12/12 6:09 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition - case upload([LINK 24-10218 11] ) [caseupld,1032u] (1738.00). Receipt number A32053099, amount $1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1