Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Sheryl H Lipman
Referred: Tu M Pham
Case #: 2:24-cv-02986
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 3:56 AM CST
Defendant
LOBI BEASLEY
individually and as an MPD MEMPHIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 201 POPLAR AVENUE
MEMPHIS, TN 38103
Defendant
C BEATY
(6842) individually and as an MPD officer MEMPHIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 201 POPLAR AVEUE
MEMPHIS, TN 38103
Defendant
CITY OF MEMPHIS (MEMPHIS POLICE DEPARTMENT)
a municipality 125 NORTH MAIN, SUITE 336
memphis, TN 38103
Defendant
B COCKMAN
(12733) individually and as an MPD officer MEMPHIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 201 POPLAR AVE
MEMPHIS, TN 38103
Defendant
Chief Cerelyn CJ Davis
in her individual capacity MEMPHIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 201 POPLAR AVENUE
memphis, TN 38103
Defendant
SGT. J. ACRED
Defendant
SGT. J. Boyd
(11189) individually and as an MPD officer MEMPHIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 201 POPLAR AVE
memphis, TN 38103
Defendant
John Does 1-4
Defendant
SGT C WINBUSH
(2876) individually and as an MPD officer MEMPHIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 201 POPLAR AVENUE
MEMPHIS, TN 38103
Plaintiff
LADARRIUS PERRY
LAST CHANCE LAW FIRM 301 WASHINGTON AVENUE, SUITE 202
MEMPHIS, TN 38103
Represented By
Kevin Whitmore
Last Chance Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 23, 2025
61 61 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 05/23 4:48 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Discovery Plan . (McMullen, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
60 60 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/21 8:27 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re56 Response to Motion filed by CITY OF MEMPHIS (MEMPHIS POLICE DEPARTMENT), Cerelyn CJ Davis. (McMullen, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
59 59 notice Setting Letter Mon 05/19 10:24 AM
SETTING LETTER: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure has been RESET to WEDNESDAY, WESDNESDAY, MAY 28, 2025 at 3:00 P.M. before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman in Courtroom No. 1, on the 11th floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee. If the parties consent to have the case heard by the magistrate, please file your consent and this conference will be cancelled. Counsel should be prepared to discuss all pending motions. PLEASE REVIEW THE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS. (jpw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
58 58 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/16 4:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING57 MOTION TO RESET MAY 22, 2025, SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference RESET to May 28, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/16/2025. (shl)
Related: [-]