California Central District Court
Judge:Maria A Audero
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:24-cv-10702
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
17 17 misc Reply Tue 04/22 1:37 PM
REPLY filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kyle Burnett to Brief (non-motion non-appeal)14 in support of Plaintiff's Brief (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
16 16 misc Brief (non-motion non-appeal) Wed 04/09 8:24 AM
BRIEF filed by Defendant Carolyn Colvin. (Bolin, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 03/26 10:24 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Timothy R. Bolin counsel for Defendant Carolyn Colvin. Adding Timothy R. Bolin as counsel of record for Acting Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Acting Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Timothy R. Bolin added to party Carolyn Colvin(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
14 14 misc Brief (non-motion non-appeal) Wed 03/19 12:06 PM
BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kyle Burnett. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
13 13 order For Order Thu 03/13 6:34 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: granting12 REQUEST for Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the briefing schedule is amended: Plaintiff's opening brief due: March 24, 2025; Defendant answering brief due: April 23, 2025; Plaintiff's optional reply due: May 7, 2025. (et)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Order Thu 03/13 1:29 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Brief filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kyle Burnett.(Rohlfing, Lawrence) Modified on 3/13/2025 (cio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 13, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 02/13 8:55 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) (mj) filed by Defendant Carolyn Colvin.(Tarn, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Page,
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index,
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable,
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions,
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices,
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development,
Att: 7 Disability Related Development,
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1,
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2,
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3,
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4,
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 5
Monday, December 23, 2024
10 10 notice Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge Mon 12/23 10:16 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 2:24-CV-10702-MAA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. RE: Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) - Non-Final9 , Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) - Non-Final8 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
9 9 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) Fri 12/20 3:58 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kyle Burnett. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
8 8 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) Thu 12/19 3:43 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Carolyn Colvin. (Attorney Jennifer Tarn added to party Carolyn Colvin(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
7 7 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Tue 12/17 10:19 AM
ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter GRANTING REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)2 . (jp)
Related: [-]
6 6 8 pgs order Order Mon 12/16 10:26 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . See document for further information. (es)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Sunday, December 15, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Sun 12/15 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 12/12 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kyle Burnett, (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 12/12 11:29 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kyle Burnett. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Thu 12/12 11:28 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kyle Burnett. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 12/12 11:24 AM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kyle Burnett. (Attorney Lawrence D. Rohlfing added to party Bradley Kyle Burnett(pty:pla))(Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]