Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Beth Phillips
Case #: 2:24-cv-04217
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 3:19 AM CST
Defendant
Camden County, Missouri
1 Court Circle
Camdenton, MO 65020
Defendant
Tonia Bailey
Defendant
John Doe # 1
Defendant
John Doe # 2
Defendant
John Doe # 3
Defendant
Tony Helms
Defendant
Bryan Vinson
in his individual and official capacity as Camden County Jail Administrator 1 Court Circl, NW Ste 13
Camdenton, MO 65020
Plaintiff
Joshua Glenn Miller
Represented By
Matthew Alexander Perry
Perry Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
32 32 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Thu 04/24 4:08 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re31 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Paul F. Gordon on behalf of Defendants Hunter Austin, Tonia Bailey, FNU Burton, Camden County, Missouri, Tony Helms, William C Koncen, Dakota McGuire, FNU Tillett, FNU Tryon, Bryan Vinson, Nathan C Weems. Related [+] (Gordon, Paul)
Related: [-] 31
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Petition
31 31 motion Dismiss Case Thu 04/24 4:07 PM
MOTION to dismiss case filed by Paul F. Gordon on behalf of Hunter Austin, Tonia Bailey, FNU Burton, Camden County, Missouri, Tony Helms, William C Koncen, Dakota McGuire, FNU Tillett, FNU Tryon, Bryan Vinson, Nathan C Weems. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/8/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Paul F. Gordon added to party FNU Tillett(pty:dft), Attorney Paul F. Gordon added to party FNU Tryon(pty:dft))(Gordon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
30 30 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 04/21 2:43 PM
ORDER granting29 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed on 4/21/2025 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion File Excess Pages Mon 04/21 11:47 AM
Second MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Jacob Donald Bielenberg on behalf of Hunter Austin, Tonia Bailey, FNU Burton, Camden County, Missouri, Tony Helms, William C Koncen, Dakota McGuire, FNU Tillett, FNU Tryon, Bryan Vinson, Nathan C Weems. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/5/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Jacob Donald Bielenberg added to party FNU Tillett(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Donald Bielenberg added to party FNU Tryon(pty:dft))(Bielenberg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/17 12:19 PM
ORDER granting27 Defendants Camden County, Tony Helms, Bryan Vinson, Halley Burton, William C. Koncen, Hunter Austin, Nathan C. Weems, Dakota McGuire, and Tonia Bailey's Consent Motion for Extension of time to File Answer is GRANTED, up to and including April 24, 2025. Signed on 4/17/25 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/16 4:07 PM
Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Jacob Donald Bielenberg on behalf of Hunter Austin, Tonia Bailey, FNU Burton, Camden County, Missouri, Tony Helms, William C Koncen, Dakota McGuire, Bryan Vinson, Nathan C Weems. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/30/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Bielenberg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
26 26 order Rule 16 Notice Tue 04/08 12:52 PM
ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/23/2025. Rule 26 conference due by 5/9/2025. Signed on 4/8/25 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
25 25 order Letter of reassignment Mon 04/07 3:42 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. to Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This case number shall now read: 2:24-cv-04217-BP. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 10:51 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Grider, Brooklyn Jackson, Susan Kidman, Todd O'Dell, FNU Tillett and FNU Tryon. Summons e-mailed to plaintiffs counsel for service. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/03 8:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Hunter Austin, Tonia Bailey, Burton [FNU], Camden County, Missouri, Tony Helms, William C Koncen, Dakota McGuire, Bryan Vinson, Nathan C Weems, Brooklyn Jackson, [FNU] Tryon, [FNU] Tillett, Susan Kidman, Todd O'Dell, Anthony Grider filed by Matthew Alexander Perry on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Perry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 14,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 15,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 16,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 17,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 18,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 19,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 20,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 21,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 22,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 23,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 24,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 25,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 26,
Att: 15 Index Index - SAC
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
23 23 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 04/02 1:33 PM
ORDER granting20 motion for leave to file modified Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is granted leave to file the proposed modified Second Amended Complaint [20-1] as a separate and independent electronic docket entry on or before April 9, 2025. Signed on 4/2/2025 by Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIntosh, Michal-Ane)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/02 11:28 AM
NOTICE of filing Defendants' Second Consent to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint by Camden County, Missouri, Hunter Austin, William C Koncen, Nathan C Weems, Dakota McGuire, Tony Helms, Burton [FNU], Bryan Vinson, Tonia Bailey (Bielenberg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
21 21 order Order Thu 03/27 2:43 PM
ORDER re20 Second Motion for Leave to File Modified Proposed Second Amended Complaint. Defendants are directed to respond to20 Second Motion for Leave to File Modified Proposed Second Amended Complaint and indicate whether they object to the motion on or before April 2, 2025. Signed on 3/27/2025 by Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIntosh, Michal-Ane)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Leave to File Document Thu 03/27 10:13 AM
Second MOTION for leave to file [Modified] Proposed Second Amended Complaint filed by Matthew Alexander Perry on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/10/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Perry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1-A - Modified Proposed Second Amended Complaint - 3 26-2025
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-B - Proposed Index for SAC 3 26-2025
Att: 3 Exhibit Proposed SAC Exhibit 23 - Redacted,
Att: 4 Exhibit Proposed SAC Exhibit 24 - Redacted,
Att: 5 Exhibit Proposed - SAC Exhibit 25 - Redacted,
Att: 6 Exhibit Proposed - SAC Exhibit 26 - Redacted
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
19 19 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 03/25 7:44 PM
ORDER granting16 motion for leave to file second amended complaint. Plaintiff is granted leave to file the proposed second amended complaint [16-1] as a separate and independent electronic docket entry on or before March 28, 2025. Signed on 3/25/2025 by Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIntosh, Michal-Ane)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Filing Tue 03/25 4:02 PM
NOTICE of filing Defendants' Consent to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint by Camden County, Missouri, Hunter Austin, William C Koncen, Nathan C Weems, Dakota McGuire, Tony Helms, Burton [FNU], Bryan Vinson, Tonia Bailey (Bielenberg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
17 17 order Order Thu 03/20 1:52 PM
ORDER re16 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Defendants are directed to respond to16 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and indicate whether they object to the motion on or before March 26, 2025. Signed on 3/20/2025 by Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIntosh, Michal-Ane)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Leave to File Document Thu 03/20 12:59 PM
MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and to Add Parties filed by Matthew Alexander Perry on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/3/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Perry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Tue 03/18 1:24 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 4/8/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/12 11:03 AM
NOTICE of appearance by Clark L Jones on behalf of Joshua Glenn Miller (Attorney Clark L Jones added to party Joshua Glenn Miller(pty:pla))(Jones, Clark)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 03/10 4:45 PM
ORDER granting13 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed on 3/10/2025 by Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIntosh, Michal-Ane)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion File Excess Pages Mon 03/10 4:30 PM
MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Jacob Donald Bielenberg on behalf of Camden County, Missouri, Hunter Austin, William C Koncen, Nathan C Weems, Dakota McGuire, Tony Helms, Burton [FNU], Bryan Vinson, Tonia Bailey. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/24/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Bielenberg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 4:28 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Jacob Donald Bielenberg on behalf of Camden County, Missouri, Hunter Austin, William C Koncen, Nathan C Weems, Dakota McGuire, Tony Helms, Burton [FNU], Bryan Vinson, Tonia Bailey (Attorney Jacob Donald Bielenberg added to party Camden County, Missouri(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Donald Bielenberg added to party Hunter Austin(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Donald Bielenberg added to party William C Koncen(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Donald Bielenberg added to party Nathan C Weems(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Donald Bielenberg added to party Dakota McGuire(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Donald Bielenberg added to party Tony Helms(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Donald Bielenberg added to party Burton [FNU](pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Donald Bielenberg added to party Bryan Vinson(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Donald Bielenberg added to party Tonia Bailey(pty:dft))(Bielenberg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 4:27 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Paul F. Gordon on behalf of Hunter Austin, William C Koncen, Nathan C Weems, Dakota McGuire, Tony Helms, Burton [FNU], Bryan Vinson, Tonia Bailey (Attorney Paul F. Gordon added to party Hunter Austin(pty:dft), Attorney Paul F. Gordon added to party William C Koncen(pty:dft), Attorney Paul F. Gordon added to party Nathan C Weems(pty:dft), Attorney Paul F. Gordon added to party Dakota McGuire(pty:dft), Attorney Paul F. Gordon added to party Tony Helms(pty:dft), Attorney Paul F. Gordon added to party Burton [FNU](pty:dft), Attorney Paul F. Gordon added to party Bryan Vinson(pty:dft), Attorney Paul F. Gordon added to party Tonia Bailey(pty:dft))(Gordon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/26 1:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tonia Bailey, Camden County, Missouri, Tony Helms, Bryan Vinson, Hunter Austin, William C Koncen, Nathan C Weems, Dakota McGuire, Burton [FNU] filed by Matthew Alexander Perry on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Perry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBITS 1-5 [Miller 08 09-2024 ,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 14 - Discharge Letter from Lake Hospital Time Stamped [August 9 2024] at [14_47 PM],
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - September 5, 2024 Email and Sunshine Request Form,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - September 19, 2024, Follow-Up,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - September 24, 2024, Follow-Up,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - One 1 Paragraph Response,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - September 30, 2024, Final Demand,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 20 - Demand - December 9 2024,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 21 - Commissioner's Response
9 9 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 02/26 9:50 AM
ORDER granting8 motion for leave to file First Amended Complaint and Add Parties. Plaintiff shall electronically file his Amended Complaint on or before March 4, 2025. Signed on 2/26/2025 by Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIntosh, Michal-Ane)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Wed 02/26 4:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hunter Austin, Burton [FNU], William C Koncen, Dakota McGuire, and Nathan C Weems. Provided summons to plaintiffs counsel for service. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
8 8 motion Leave to File Document Tue 02/25 8:51 PM
MOTION for leave to file First Amended Complaint and Add Parties filed by Matthew Alexander Perry on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/11/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Perry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint
Monday, January 27, 2025
notice Notice of Docket Modification Mon 01/27 3:20 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 01/24/2025 as Document No. 7, Return of Service of Complaint. The document has been deleted as it was a duplicate filing. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
7 7 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Fri 01/24 4:19 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants.(Perry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Return - Vinson,
Att: 2 Affidavit Return - Camden County MO,
Att: 3 Affidavit Return - Helms,
Att: 4 Affidavit Return - Doe 1,
Att: 5 Affidavit Return - Doe 2,
Att: 6 Affidavit Return - Doe 3,
Att: 7 Affidavit Return - Bailey
6 6 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Fri 01/24 12:32 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Perry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
service Summons Issued Fri 01/17 1:05 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tonia Bailey, Camden County Missouri, John Doe # 1, John Doe # 2, John Doe # 3, Tony Helms and Bryan Vinson. Emailed to plaintiffs counsel for service. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
5 5 order Notice of Pretrial Procedure Tue 12/17 9:29 AM
ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 12/17/2024 by Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIntosh, Michal-Ane)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
4 4 cmp Complaint Mon 12/16 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Tonia Bailey, Camden County, Missouri, John Doe # 1, John Doe # 2, John Doe # 3, Tony Helms, Bryan Vinson. Service due by 3/17/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Friday, December 13, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 12/13 10:56 AM
ORDER granting1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 12/13/2024 by Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (McIntosh, Michal-Ane)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of MAPNII Fri 12/13 8:37 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Fri 12/13 8:39 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 1/3/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 12/12 4:36 PM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Matthew Alexander Perry on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/26/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Attorney Matthew Alexander Perry added to party Joshua Glenn Miller(pty:pla))(Perry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Financial Status - Affidavit - Inmate Recently Released,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Second Demand,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B - Commissioners' Response,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit C - Patient Discharge Letter,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit D - Medication List,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit E - September 5 2024 Sunshine Request,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit F - September 5 2024 Email and Sunshine Request,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit G - September 19, 2024 - Follow- Up Email,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit H - September 24 2024 Follow Up Email,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit I - Records Custodian One Paragraph Response,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit J - Final Demand for Sunshine Complaince