Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-13505

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph G Rosania Jr
Case #: 1:24-ap-01275
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Robert M. Quein
Represented By
Robert M. Quein
contact info
Plaintiff
Robertson B. Cohen
Represented By
Robertson B. Cohen
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Sunday, March 09, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/09 11:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 7016 Scheduling Order
Friday, March 07, 2025
10 10 order 7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary) Fri 03/07 11:50 AM
7016 Scheduling Order RE: Related [+]. Any requested amendments to this Order are due on or before 03/21/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 5/9/2025, Disclosures and written reports due by 5/23/2025. Discovery due by 7/18/2025, Dispositive Motion due 8/15/2025, documents due by 9/15/2025, and other documents due by 09/29/2025, Pre-Trial Conference to be held on 10/7/2025 at 11:30 AM Courtroom B. (ccr)
Related: [-] 9 7026f Report
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
9 9 misc 7026 (f) Report Wed 03/05 3:50 PM
Joint F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Patrick R. Akers on behalf of Robertson B. Cohen Related [+]. (Akers, Patrick)
Related: [-] 7 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Thursday, January 23, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/23 10:24 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
7 7 order Compliance With Rules Tue 01/21 4:23 PM
Order Regarding Compliance With FED.R.BANKR.P. 7026(Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a) and (f)). Related [+]. Rules Compliance due by 3/6/2025 for5 and for1 , (mmg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Answer to Complaint
Monday, January 13, 2025
6 6 answer Response Tue 01/14 1:27 PM
Response Filed by Jason A. Kinnaird on behalf of Rodney Quein Related [+]. (rxc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, January 09, 2025
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/09 10:24 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Mark H. Kane on behalf of Robert M. Quein Related [+]. (Kane, Mark)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
4 4 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Wed 12/18 12:14 PM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
notice Request for Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Wed 12/18 12:14 PM
This adversary Proceeding has been commenced by the trustee or debtor-in-possession. Pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule promulgated by the Judicial Conference of the United States pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1930(b), payment of the filing fee for commencing a proceeding by the trustee or debtor-in-possession is payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. Until such time as there are sufficient funds available from the estate to pay this filing fee, the trustee or debtor-in-possession hereby requests that the filing fee be deferred. Filed by Patrick R. Akers on behalf of Robertson B. Cohen. (Akers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/17 12:49 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Patrick R. Akers on behalf of Robertson B. Cohen Related [+]. (Akers, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Friday, December 13, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 12/13 2:41 PM
Summons Issued on Robert M. Quein Answer Due 01/13/2025. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Akers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/12 9:47 AM
Adversary case 24-01275 Complaint by Robertson B. Cohen against Robert M. Quein. Fee to be Deferred. Adversary Status Deadline 03/12/2025 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Akers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deed