Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Becerra
Referred: Edwin G Torres
Case #: 1:24-cv-24869
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2025 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By
Freddy Funes
Toth Funes PA
contact info
Brian W. Toth
Toth Funes PA
contact info
Defendant
AV NUTRACEUTICALS LLC
Represented By
Gabriella Hormazabal
Wda Legal
contact info
Hernando Diaz-Candia
Wda Legal
contact info
Defendant
BIODOSE IP HOLDING, LLC
Represented By
Gabriella Hormazabal
Wda Legal
contact info
Hernando Diaz-Candia
Wda Legal
contact info
Defendant
NUTRITION FORMULATORS, INC.
Defendant
AURA SANTAMARTA
Represented By
Gabriella Hormazabal
Wda Legal
contact info
Hernando Diaz-Candia
Wda Legal
contact info
Defendant
YOHANA SANTAMARTA
Represented By
Gabriella Hormazabal
Wda Legal
contact info
Hernando Diaz-Candia
Wda Legal
contact info
Defendant
WALMART INC.
Represented By
Richard Eric Gaum
Taft Stettinius , Hollister LLP
contact info
Defendant
eBAY INC.
Represented By
Nicole Ballante Rankin
Holland And Knight
contact info
Plaintiff
BIO DOSE PHARMA LLC
5307 NW 108 Ave
Sunrise, FL 33351
Represented By
Paula Alejandra Martinez
Agentis PLLC
contact info
Receiver
ROBERT P. CHARBONNEAU
Receiver of Bio Dose Pharma LLC Agentis PLLC 45 Almeria Ave
Coral Gables, FL 33134
Represented By
Paula Alejandra Martinez
Agentis PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
79 79 minutes Miscellaneous Hearing ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 05/15 12:29 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jacqueline Becerra: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 5/13/2025. Order to follow. Total time in court: 20 minutes. Attorney Appearances: Robert Paul Charbonneau, Hernando Diaz-Candia, Gabriella Hormazabal, Paula Alejandra Martinez, Javier Jesus Rodriguez, Brian W. Toth. Court Reporter: Vernita Allen-Williams, 305-523-5048 / Vernita_Allen-Williams@flsd.uscourts.gov. (iar)
Related: [-]
78 78 motion Leave to File Document Tue 05/13 9:20 PM
Corrected MOTION for Leave to File answer, counterclaims and motion for preliminary injunction by YOHANA SANTAMARTA, AURA SANTAMARTA, BIODOSE IP HOLDING, LLC, AV NUTRACEUTICALS LLC. (Diaz-Candia, Hernando)
Related: [-]
77 77 motion Leave to File Document Tue 05/13 6:20 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File answer, counterclaims and motion for preliminary injunction by YOHANA SANTAMARTA, AURA SANTAMARTA, BIODOSE IP HOLDING, LLC, AV NUTRACEUTICALS LLC. (Diaz-Candia, Hernando)
Related: [-]
76 76 notice Notice of Unavailability Tue 05/13 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by ROBERT P. CHARBONNEAU for dates of July 1, 2025 through and including July 18, 2025 (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
75 75 minutes Remand Hearing Tue 05/13 2:11 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Remand Hearing held on 5/13/2025. Order to follow. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Robert Paul Charbonneau, Hernando Diaz-Candia, Gabriella Hormazabal, Paula Alejandra Martinez, Javier Jesus Rodriguez, Brian W. Toth. (Digital 11:03:43) (ogn1)
Related: [-]
74 74 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/13 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Javier Jesus Rodriguez on behalf of ROBERT P. CHARBONNEAU (Rodriguez, Javier)
Related: [-]
73 73 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/13 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Javier Jesus Rodriguez on behalf of ROBERT P. CHARBONNEAU. Attorney Javier Jesus Rodriguez added to party ROBERT P. CHARBONNEAU(pty:rc). (Rodriguez, Javier)
Related: [-]
72 72 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/13 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Paul Charbonneau on behalf of ROBERT P. CHARBONNEAU. Attorney Robert Paul Charbonneau added to party ROBERT P. CHARBONNEAU(pty:rc). (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
71 71 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/13 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paula Alejandra Martinez on behalf of ROBERT P. CHARBONNEAU (Martinez, Paula)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
70 70 order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Mon 05/12 6:53 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING HEARING ON19 Motion to Remand to State Court and Motion to Abate: Remand Hearing set for 5/13/2025 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres, United States Courthouse, James Lawrence King Bldg., Courtroom 5 - Tenth Floor, 99 N.E. 4th Street, Miami, Florida. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/12/2025. (EGT)
Related: [-]
69 69 respm Reply in Support of Motion Mon 05/12 6:31 PM
REPLY in Support of Motion re63 MOTION TO DISMISS50 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Answer to Counterclaim,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Prejudice . and In Opposition to Response to Receiver's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim 66 filed by ROBERT P. CHARBONNEAU. (Martinez, Paula)
Related: [-]
68 68 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 05/12 2:15 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. The Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for May 13, 2025, at 8:30 A.M. is hereby RESET for May 13, 2025 , at 9:00 A.M. before the undersigned at the Wilkie D. Ferguson, Jr. Courthouse, Courtroom 11-4, 400 N. Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida. **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Signed by Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 5/12/2025. (rs01)
Related: [-]