Wyoming District Court
Judge:Scott W Skavdahl
Referred: Stephanie A Hambrick
Case #: 1:24-cv-00258
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 2:39 AM MST
Defendant
Brian Beisher
Represented By
Jay A Gilbertz
Yonkee & Toner
contact info
Defendant
Black Gold Land Company LLC
Represented By
Jay A Gilbertz
Yonkee & Toner
contact info
Defendant
Cameron Dobson
Defendant
Annette Rinaldo
Represented By
Jay A Gilbertz
Yonkee & Toner
contact info
Defendant
Brad Walden
Represented By
Jay A Gilbertz
Yonkee & Toner
contact info
Defendant
Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Beisher
Represented By
Jay A Gilbertz
Yonkee & Toner
contact info
Defendant
Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Dobson
Defendant
Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Rinaldo
Represented By
Jay A Gilbertz
Yonkee & Toner
contact info
Defendant
Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Walden
Represented By
Jay A Gilbertz
Yonkee & Toner
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Ely
Represented By
Jason J. Friedl
Romanucci & Blandin LLC
contact info
Christopher M Brennan
Woodhouse Roden Ames & Brennan, LLC
contact info
Third-Party Defendant
Richard Ely
1249 Hermans Orchard
Florissant, MO 62034
Third-Party Plaintiff
Black Gold Land Company LLC
Represented By
Jay A Gilbertz
Yonkee & Toner
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
38 38 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 05/12 1:46 PM
(TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing: VIA ZOOM - NOTE: 1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely;the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record. 2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues. 3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking. ***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2025 02:00 PM in Yellowstone Justice Center before US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick. Parties should have their calendars on hand for scheduling. Under Local Rule 16.1(a)(2) the parties are reminded to file a written Joint Case Management Plan three business days prior to the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference. The Plan form may be located at www.wyd.uscourts.gov/judges-info under Judge Hambrick. (Court Staff, sjj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/09 2:46 PM
NOTICE by Third-Party Defendant Richard Ely NOTICE OF SERVICE OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS F.R.C.P. RULE 26 DISCLOSURES (Kuker, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/25 11:35 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Proof of Service re33 Clerk's Entry of Default. (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/22 2:03 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Ryan Ely of Service of Rule 26 Disclosures (Brennan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
34 34 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 04/21 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Matthew Kuker on behalf of Richard Ely (Kuker, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
33 33 misc Clerks Entry of Default Mon 04/14 11:36 AM
CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed against Camerson Dobson by the Clerk of Court, Margaret Botkins. (Copies sent to both addresses for defaulted defendant via US Mail. CM #s: 7006 0810 0002 6582 9967; 7006 0810 0002 6582 9950) (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice) Fri 04/11 10:40 AM
Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Patrick Driscoll on behalf of Ryan Ely Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2605618. (Driscoll, Patrick) Modified on 4/11/2025 (Court Staff, smek)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice) Fri 04/11 10:35 AM
Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Michael Cerasa on behalf of Ryan Ely Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2605613. (Cerasa, Michael) Modified on 4/11/2025 (Court Staff, smek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
30 30 misc Application Thu 04/10 9:27 AM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Ryan Ely. (Brennan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 4:44 PM
ORDER by the US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick granting27 Motion for Michael Cerasa to appear pro hac vice; granting28 Motion for Patrick Driscoll to appear pro hac vice; filed by Plaintiff Ryan Ely. (cc: counsel via email) (Court Staff, semt) (Main Document 29 replaced to correct typo on 4/8/2025) (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 3:14 PM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Stephanie A Hambrick. Amended MOTION for Patrick Driscoll to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Ryan Ely.(Brennan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
27 27 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 3:10 PM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Stephanie A Hambrick. Amended MOTION for Michael Cerasa to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Ryan Ely.(Brennan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 1:28 PM
ORDER by the US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick denying24 Motion for Michael Cerasa to appear pro hac vice ; denying25 Motion for Patrick Driscoll to appear pro hac vice; filed by Plaintiff Ryan Ely. Local counsel shall file Amended Motions, along with Amended Affidavits, pursuant to Local Rule 84.2(b), for the Court to further consider Micahel D. Cerasa and Patrick J. Driscoll's requests for pro hac admission. (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
misc Financial Entry Tue 04/08 4:18 PM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR MICHAEL D CERASA. RECEIPT 2-4504 (Court Staff, smek)
Related: [-]
misc Financial Entry Tue 04/08 4:21 PM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR PATRICK J DRISCOLL. RECEIPT 2-4505 (Court Staff, smek)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
25 25 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 10:20 AM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Stephanie A Hambrick. MOTION for Patrick Driscoll to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Ryan Ely.(Brennan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 10:12 AM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Stephanie A Hambrick. MOTION for Michael Cerasa to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Ryan Ely.(Brennan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, February 10, 2025
23 23 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Mon 02/10 1:50 PM
ANSWER to8 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,, by Richard Ely. (Overstreet, L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/06 10:05 AM
NOTICE by Third-Party Plaintiff Black Gold Land Company LLC re13 Summons Issued Return of Service Richard Ely (Gilbertz, Jay)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/31 1:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Ely. Cameron Dobson served on 1/9/2025, answer due on 1/31/2025 (Brennan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
20 20 service Acceptance of Service Fri 01/17 9:50 AM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE to Complaint filed by Ryan Ely. Brian Beisher served on 1/15/2025, answer due 2/5/2025; Annette Rinaldo served on 12/14/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Brad Walden served on 12/17/2024, answer due 1/7/2025. (Brennan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice) Thu 01/16 5:27 PM
Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Jason J. Friedl on behalf of Ryan Ely (Friedl, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/15 8:34 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Ely. Cameron Dobson served on 1/10/2025, answer due on 1/31/2025 (Brennan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
17 17 order Recusal Wed 01/08 11:38 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL by the Honorable Scott P Klosterman. US Magistrate Judge Scott P Klosterman recused. Case reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick for all further referral proceedings. (Court Staff, sbrr)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 04, 2025
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Sat 01/04 1:49 PM
Third NOTICE by Defendants Annette Rinaldo, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Beisher, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Rinaldo, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Walden, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Dobson, Black Gold Land Company LLC, Brian Beisher, Brad Walden, Third-Party Plaintiffs Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Walden, Black Gold Land Company LLC, Brad Walden, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Rinaldo, Annette Rinaldo, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Beisher, Brian Beisher re14 Notice (Other),, Amended Rule 7.1 Disclosure (Gilbertz, Jay)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
15 15 order Order Fri 01/03 3:04 PM
(TEXT-ONLY) ORDER requiring Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff Black Gold Land Company, LLC to submit an Amended Disclosure Statement under F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual and entity who is a member (holds an interest in) Black Gold Land Company, LLC. An LLCs citizenship is determined by all of its members citizenships, see Mgmt. Nominees, Inc. v. Alderney Invs., LLC, 813 F.3d 1321, 1322 (10th Cir. 2016). The disclosures filed to date fail to identify the members of Black Gold Land Company, LLC. This Court must determine citizenship for each member, and each unincorporated-entity members member holding an interest in Black Gold Land Company, LLC. Siloam Springs Hotel, L.L.C. v. Century Sur. Co., 781 F.3d 1233, 1237-38 (10th Cir. 2015) (unincorporated entitys citizenship for diversity purposes is based upon the citizenship of each of its members). The Amended Disclosure Statement shall be due 1/10/2025. by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Skavdahl, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/02 5:35 PM
Second NOTICE by Defendants Annette Rinaldo, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Beisher, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Rinaldo, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Walden, Black Gold Land Company LLC, Brian Beisher, Brad Walden, Third-Party Plaintiffs Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Walden, Black Gold Land Company LLC, Brad Walden, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Rinaldo, Annette Rinaldo, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Beisher, Brian Beisher Rule 7.1 Disclosure (Gilbertz, Jay)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Thu 01/02 2:25 PM
Summons Issued (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Praecipe Thu 01/02 2:15 PM
Praecipe for Summons Issuance filed by Third-Party Plaintiff Black Gold Land Company LLC (Gilbertz, Jay) (Attachment 1 flattened on 1/2/2025) (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Summons
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 01/02 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay A Gilbertz on behalf of Annette Rinaldo, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Beisher, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Rinaldo, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Walden, Black Gold Land Company LLC, Brad Walden, Brian Beisher (Gilbertz, Jay)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/02 2:10 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Black Gold Land Company LLC, Third-Party Plaintiff Black Gold Land Company LLC re8 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint, Rule 7.1 Disclosure (Gilbertz, Jay)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Complexity (Non) Thu 01/02 2:06 PM
NOTICE of complexity by Defendants Annette Rinaldo, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Beisher, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Rinaldo, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Walden, Black Gold Land Company LLC, Brian Beisher, Brad Walden, Third-Party Plaintiffs Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Walden, Black Gold Land Company LLC, Brad Walden, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Rinaldo, Annette Rinaldo, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Beisher, Brian Beisher; this case is non-complex. (Gilbertz, Jay)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Thu 01/02 2:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendant Richard L. Ely by Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Walden, Black Gold Land Company LLC, Brad Walden, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Rinaldo, Annette Rinaldo, Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Beisher, Brian Beisher. (Gilbertz, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix 1
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/02 11:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Ely. Black Gold Land Company LLC served on 12/14/2024, answer due on 1/6/2025 (Brennan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/02 11:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Ely. Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Rinaldo served on 12/14/2024, answer due on 1/6/2025 (Brennan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/02 11:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Ely. Black Gold Land Company LLC Agent Walden served on 12/17/2024, answer due on 1/7/2025 (Brennan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
misc Financial Entry Fri 12/27 9:10 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR JASON J. FRIEDL. RECEIPT 2-4035 (Court Staff, smek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/18 4:04 PM
ORDER by the US Magistrate Judge Scott P Klosterman granting3 MOTION for Jason J. Friedl to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Ryan Ely. (cc: counsel via email) (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/18 2:47 PM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Scott P Klosterman. MOTION for Jason J. Friedl to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Ryan Ely.(Brennan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 12, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 12/12 10:58 AM
Summonses Issued (Court Staff, stmo)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/12 10:57 AM
COMPLAINT (8 summonses issued) with Jury Demand. (Filing fee $405 receipt 2-3992 , filed by Ryan Ely. (Court Staff, stmo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Magistrate Consent