Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-03254

California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:J Barrett Marum
Case #: 3:24-ap-90099
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Balboa Thrift and Loan
865 Amena Court
Chula Vista, CA 91910
Represented By
Balboa Thrift and Loan
contact info
Plaintiffs
Ronald E. Stadtmueller, Chapter 7 Trustee
10755 Scripps Poway Pkwy., #370
San Diego, CA 92131
Represented By
Ronald E. Stadtmueller
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
9 9 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sat 02/08 9:09 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 02/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Entry of Default
8 8 notice Default (Notice)(CSD 1880)(BNC) Thu 02/06 4:38 PM
Notice of Entry of Default Related [+] (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 7 Request to Enter Default
7 7 motion Default (Request)(CSD 3030) Thu 02/06 6:40 AM
Request to Enter Default with Certificate of Service. filed by Ronald E. Stadtmueller on behalf of Ronald E. Stadtmueller. (Stadtmueller, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration OF RONALD E. STADTMUELLER IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT & DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 (CSD 3018) Wed 12/11 1:43 PM
Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 filed by Ronald E. Stadtmueller on behalf of Ronald E. Stadtmueller. (Stadtmueller, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CSD 3018
5 5 cmp Return of Summons Served Wed 12/11 1:41 PM
Summons Served on: Ronald E. Stadtmueller. Served On 12/11/2024 filed by Ronald E. Stadtmueller on behalf of Ronald E. Stadtmueller. (Stadtmueller, Ronald)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Defer Payment of Fee for filing Complaint (Order) Wed 12/11 1:29 PM
Order APPROVING Application to Defer Payment of Fee for Filing Complaint 3:24-ap-90099 . IT IS ORDERED the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court shall cause a copy of this Order to be transmitted to the court of jurisdiction over the underlying bankruptcy case for docketing; and that any deferred filing fees be collected from the estate, if any, created for the underlying case unless otherwise directed by the court. Mark T. Schnakenberg, Clerk of Court signed on 12/11/2024. (Admin)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Defer Payment of Fee for Filing Complaint by Trustee or DIP (Application) (CSD 2017) Wed 12/11 1:29 PM
Application by Trustee or DIP to Defer Payment of Fee for Filing Complaint 3:24-ap-90099. filed by Ronald E. Stadtmueller on behalf of Ronald E. Stadtmueller. Related [+] (Stadtmueller, Ronald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 court Summons Issued (CSD 2500A) (auto) Wed 12/11 1:26 PM
Summons Issued on Balboa Thrift and Loan Answer Due 01/10/2025; with Certificate of Service. (Stadtmueller, Ronald)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 12/11 1:26 PM
Adversary case 24-90099 Complaint by Ronald E. Stadtmueller against Balboa Thrift and Loan. Nature of Suit: 12 Related [+] , Fee Amount $ 0.0 Filed by Ronald E. Stadtmueller on behalf of Ronald E. Stadtmueller. Filing fee collected, receipt #defer. (Stadtmueller, Ronald)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 Cover Sheet