California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:24-cv-10725
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 1:24 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By
Jennifer R. Brooks
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Ryan A Lewis
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Defendant
Newrez LLC
Represented By
Ian A Rambarran
Klinedinst PC
contact info
Daniel S Agle
Klinedinst PC
contact info
Jonathan Charles Cahill
Klinedinst PC
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Represented By
Charlotte Ann Long
Trans Union LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Craig A. Rogers
Represented By
Robert F Brennan
Law Offices Of Robert Brennan Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Sunday, April 27, 2025
50 50 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Sun 04/27 3:32 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Party49 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
49 49 stip Dismiss Party Thu 04/24 2:45 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Craig A. Rogers.(Brennan, Robert)
Related: [-]
48 48 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 04/24 2:09 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC., ONLY47 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party47 : Having considered the Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, the Court makes and delivers the following ruling: IT IS ORDERED that the claims and causes of action asserted herein by Plaintiff Craig A. Rogers against Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, Only, are in all respects dismissed with prejudice. (bm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
47 47 stip Dismiss Party Wed 04/23 3:39 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Craig A. Rogers.(Brennan, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Dismiss Experian ONLY
46 46 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 04/23 9:39 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AS TO EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC.(DKT.44 ) by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: On 4/10/2025, a notice of settlement was filed stating that a settlement has been reached between Plaintiff and Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. ("Experian"). The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for 6/13/2025 at 1:00 PM. If a dismissal is not filed by 6/6/2025, counsel shall file a response to the Order to Show Cause, which includes the status of the settlement and the anticipated date the dismissal will be filed. The response shall not include any substantive contents of any settlement discussions between the parties. In light of the foregoing, all dates and deadlines are vacated as to EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC. only. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc)
Related: [-]