Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Case #: 4:24-cv-01100
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 2:53 AM CST
Defendant
Ryan Beck
7953 Beck Lane
Beeville, TX 78102
Represented By
Collin Dean Kennedy
Hanshaw Kennedy, LLP
contact info
Allen A "Trey&qu Volentine, III
Hanshaw Kennedy Hafen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Trevor Burton
10235 Ashbrook Ct.
Fort Myers, FL 33913
Represented By
Collin Dean Kennedy
Hanshaw Kennedy, LLP
contact info
Allen A "Trey&qu Volentine, III
Hanshaw Kennedy Hafen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ashley Luckenbach
106 Speargrass Ln.
Odem, TX 78370
Represented By
Bradford W Irelan
Irelan Mcdaniel, PLLC
contact info
Dean John Siotos
Irelan Mcdaniel PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Ridgeway
615 Baronne Street Suite 100
New Orleans, LA 70113
Represented By
Collin Dean Kennedy
Hanshaw Kennedy, LLP
contact info
Allen A "Trey&qu Volentine, III
Hanshaw Kennedy Hafen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jamal Samaha
1534 West Walton Street
Chicago, IL 60642
Represented By
Collin Dean Kennedy
Hanshaw Kennedy, LLP
contact info
Allen A "Trey&qu Volentine, III
Hanshaw Kennedy Hafen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stone Clinical Laboratories, LLC
Florida 615 Baronne Street Suite 100
New Orleans, LA 70113
Represented By
Collin Dean Kennedy
Hanshaw Kennedy, LLP
contact info
Allen A "Trey&qu Volentine, III
Hanshaw Kennedy Hafen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stone Clinical Laboratories, LLC d/b/a Stone Diagnostics
Louisiana 615 Baronne Street Suite 100
New Orleans, LA 70113
Plaintiff
HealthTrackRx, Inc.
Sheppard Mullin c/o Amanda Cottrell 2200 Ross Ave., 20th Floor
Dallas, TX 46939
Represented By
Amanda Leigh Cottrell
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton Llp - Dallas
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Patricia Hyndman
Terminated: 01/06/2025
2943 North Lincoln Avenue Unit 113
Chicago, IL 60657


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
55 55 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/10 9:39 AM
NOTICE: Notice of Dismissal: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and following the submission of (Dkt. #54), all claims between Plaintiff HealthTrackRx, Inc., and Defendant Ashley Luckenbach are dismissed with prejudice. The clerk will terminate Defendant Ashley Luckenbach as a party in this matter. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
54 54 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/07 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Ashley Luckenbach by HealthTrackRx, Inc. (Cottrell, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
53 53 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Thu 03/06 2:59 PM
AMENDED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/6/2025. (mmc)
Related: [-]
52 52 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 03/06 2:51 PM
ORDER granting51 Joint Motion to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Extend Temporary Restraining Order. Therefore, it is ORDERED that all provisions of the TRO entered at 6:30 p.m. on Monday, February 3, 2025, (Dkt. #44), are extended until 6:30 p.m. on Thursday, June 19, 2025. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/6/2025. (mmc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 03/06 3:01 PM
NOTICE RESETTING HEARING: Preliminary Injunction Hearing RESET for 6/16/2025 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (mmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
51 51 motion Continue Wed 03/05 3:47 PM
JOINT MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Extend Temporary Restraining Order by HealthTrackRx, Inc..(Cottrell, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Extend Temporary Restraining Order