Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant
Case #: 4:24-cv-01101
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 2:54 AM CST
Defendant
Bank of America Corporation
Represented By
Grant Figari
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brent Gallow
Defendant
Theresa Pinkston
Defendant
Jeffrey Scott Smith
Represented By
Timothy Micah Dortch
Dortch Lindstrom Livingston Law Group
contact info
Stolle Voigt
Dortch Lindstrom Livingston Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Chery Lyn Pinkston
Represented By
Allison Hope Luttrell
Mims Ballew Hollingsworth, PLLC
contact info
Kelly Dean Hollingsworth
K. Hollingsworth & Associates, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
32 32 9 pgs order Protective Order Mon 03/31 4:36 PM
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant on 3/31/2025. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
31 31 3 pgs motion Protective Order Wed 03/26 8:04 AM
AGREED MOTION for Protective Order by Bank of America Corporation.(Figari, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
30 30 12 pgs respm Response to Motion Mon 03/10 4:34 PM
RESPONSE re26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jeffrey Scott Smith . (Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/10 12:21 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. It is ORDERED that the Court hereby sua sponte TRANSFERS this case to the Tyler Division of the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant on 3/10/2025. (rpc)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer Tue 03/11 10:31 AM
Intradistrict Transfer to Tyler (Case Number 6:25-cv-00080). (jmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
28 28 motion Dismiss Fri 03/07 11:31 AM
MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Petition in Intervention by Bank of America Corporation.(Figari, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 06, 2025
27 27 8 pgs respm Response to Motion Thu 03/06 4:48 PM
RESPONSE re20 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Chery Lyn Pinkston .(Luttrell, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit Bill of Sale from Chris Duke to Chery Pinkston,
Att: 3 Exhibit Bill of Sale from Chery Pinkston to Elaine Sloan,
Att: 4 Exhibit Bill of Sale from Elaine Sloan to Chery Pinkston,
Att: 5 Exhibit Order for Return of Property and Authorization for Sale of Property, Case No. FM24-00171,
Att: 6 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion from Twelfth Court of Appeals District, Case No. 12 24-00185 CV,
Att: 7 Exhibit Order Vacating Receivership, Case No. FM24-00171
Friday, February 28, 2025
utility Remark Fri 02/28 9:11 AM
The Court hereby CANCELS the March 5, 2025 Scheduling Conference; the Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (No attachment) (tls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
26 26 motion Dismiss Wed 02/26 4:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Chery Lyn Pinkston.(Luttrell, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
25 25 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/26 12:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Scott Smith. Theresa Pinkston served on 2/17/2025. (Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Mon 02/24 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Chery Lyn Pinkston (Luttrell, Allison)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 02/24 11:38 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dortch, Timothy) (rpc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/24/2025) Proposed Order
22 22 2 pgs notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Mon 02/24 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Jeffrey Scott Smith (Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Mon 02/24 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Bank of America Corporation (Figari, Grant)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
20 20 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 02/20 1:54 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jeffrey Scott Smith.(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 5 114 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 2 pgs Affidavit/Declaration
Thursday, February 06, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/06 2:35 PM
ORDER granting17 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s (BANA) Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Petition. BANA shall have until March 7, 2025, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Amended Petition in Intervention. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/6/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/06 12:54 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT In Intervention and Cross Claims against Bank of America Corporation, Chery Lyn Pinkston, Theresa Pinkston, filed by Jeffrey Scott Smith.(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/05 3:15 PM
CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Bank of America Corporation.(Figari, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Bank of America, N.A.'s Consent Motion for Ext. of Time to Resp. to the First Amended Petition
Friday, January 31, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/31 8:48 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Order Authorizing Alternative Service of Process on Defendant Theresa Pinkston. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/31/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 01/30 10:51 AM
REPLY to Response re6 MOTION to Remand filed by Chery Lyn Pinkston . (Luttrell, Allison)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
14 14 respm Response to Motion Mon 01/27 2:22 PM
RESPONSE re6 MOTION to Remand filed by Jeffrey Scott Smith . (Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 01/27 4:28 PM
Note: Defendant Bank of America was not required to pay a $405 filing fee for the Consent to Removal. The filing fee has been refunded. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Removal Fri 01/24 9:09 AM
CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Bank of America Corporation from 294th District Court, case number FM24-00171. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10638334), filed by Bank of America Corporation.(Figari, Grant) Modified text on 1/24/2025 (rpc). Modified on 1/24/2025 (xl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/22 4:31 PM
CORRECTED MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternative Service of Process on Defendant Theresa Pinkston by Jeffrey Scott Smith.(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit
misc Notice of Deficiency Wed 01/22 2:30 PM
Clerk's LR CV-10(d) Notice of Deficiency as to 11 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Jeffrey Scott Smith. - LR CV-7(i) or LR CR-47(a)(3) requires this document to include a certificate of conference that complies with the rule. Recommended cure: Within one day, Filer must refile with the word Corrected in the title of the document. The filer should use the same ECF event and when offered the docket text enhancement dropdown, select CORRECTED so it will also appear in the docket text. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/21 4:45 PM
MOTION Order Authorizing Alternative Service of Process on Defendant Theresa Pinkston by Jeffrey Scott Smith.(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Thursday, January 16, 2025
10 10 19 pgs cmp Intervenor Complaint Thu 01/16 1:40 PM
AMENDED Intervenor COMPLAINT and Cross Claim Against Chery Lyn Pinkston , filed by Jeffrey Scott Smith.(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 01/13 12:02 PM
ORDER granting in part8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Remand, Rule 26(F) Conference and Joint Report . Plaintiff's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff/Cross-Defendants Motion to Remand is extended to 1/27/2025. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/24/2025. Scheduling Conference reset for 3/5/2025 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/13/2025. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
8 8 4 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Wed 01/08 5:27 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Remand, Rule 26(F) Conference and Joint Report by Jeffrey Scott Smith.(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
7 7 3 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/07 4:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Scott Smith. Bank of America Corporation served on 1/3/2025. (Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
6 6 9 pgs motion Remand Thu 01/02 1:35 PM
MOTION to Remand by Chery Lyn Pinkston.(Luttrell, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit/Declaration Affidavit of Kelly D. Hollingsworth,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand
5 5 10 pgs order Order Governing Proceedings Thu 01/02 10:44 AM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/6/2025. Rule 16 Management Conference SET for 2/18/2025 at 02:00 PM, to be held via Zoom or telephone; instructions will follow. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/2/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 12/23 1:07 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Theresa Pinkston. (rpc)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 12/23 1:07 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Bank of America Corporation. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/17 4:13 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/17/2024. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
notice Notice of ECF Requirement Fri 12/13 10:22 AM
Notified Plaintiff's Attorneys, Constance A. Mims, Alexis Gebhardt, and Kelly D. Hollingsworth (who is admitted, but contact information out of date), Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (rpc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
1 1 4 pgs notice Notice of Removal Thu 12/12 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeffrey Scott Smith from 294th Judicial District Court, Van Zandt County, Texas, case number FM24-00171. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10554079), filed by Jeffrey Scott Smith.(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 86 pgs State Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12/13 9:51 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 12/13 9:51 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 12/13 9:55 AM
Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (rpc)
Related: [-]