Texas Western District Court
Judge:Jason K Pulliam
Referred: Elizabeth S Chestney
Case #: 5:24-cv-01418
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 3:38 AM CST
Defendant
Cruising Kitchens, LLC
Plaintiff
Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
D. Craig Brinker
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By
D. Craig Brinker
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Trumball Insurance Company
Represented By
D. Craig Brinker
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/25 11:03 AM
Text Order GRANTING15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
17 17 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/26 7:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Mediation Completed by 5/23/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 5/23/2025, Discovery due by 9/22/2025, Motions due by 11/4/2025,. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vl)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 03/26 7:45 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/24/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Zoom.)(vl)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/24 4:35 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by D. Craig Brinker for Attorney Connor R. McKinney ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19952359) by on behalf of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Trumball Insurance Company.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Brinker, D.)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/24 1:59 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brock Russell Skelley ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19950636) by on behalf of Cruising Kitchens, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Skelley, Brock)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 03/24 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brock Russell Skelley on behalf of Cruising Kitchens, LLC. Attorney Brock Russell Skelley added to party Cruising Kitchens, LLC(pty:dft) (Skelley, Brock)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/24 3:19 PM
Text Order GRANTING14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
12 12 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Fri 03/21 12:00 AM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan submitted by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Trumball Insurance Company. (Wilson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
11 11 misc Proposed Order Wed 03/19 11:10 PM
Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order to9 Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Wilson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 03/19 11:37 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Discovery Case Management Plan by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Trumball Insurance Company.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Brinker, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 03/19 12:28 PM
Text Order GRANTING10 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. The parties shall file their Rule 26(f) Report and scheduling recommendations by March 20, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lslc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
9 9 4 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 02/14 4:14 PM
ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2025 3:00 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Mon 02/03 4:50 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cruising Kitchens, LLC. (Wehmeyer, Corey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/30 5:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Corey Frank Wehmeyer added to party Cruising Kitchens, LLC(pty:dft) by Cruising Kitchens, LLC.(Wehmeyer, Corey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
6 6 service Acknowledgment of Service Wed 01/15 4:51 PM
Acknowledgment of Service returned by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Trumball Insurance Company. Cruising Kitchens, LLC served on 1/9/2025, answer due 2/10/2025. (Brinker, D.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 01/03 11:08 AM
Summons Issued as to Cruising Kitchens, LLC. (bt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 01/02 6:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Trumball Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Brinker, D.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
3 3 4 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 12/16 1:58 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
Related: [-]
2 2 5 pgs order Order Mon 12/16 6:02 AM
STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/12 6:08 PM
COMPLAINT Original Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19575408). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Trumball Insurance Company.(Brinker, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Demand Letter,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12/13 10:51 AM
Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (vl)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Fri 12/13 10:51 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (vl)
Related: [-]