Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Ewing Werlein, Jr
Case #: 4:24-cv-04884
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Terminated:Feb 28, 2025
Case in other court:55th District Court of Harris County, TX, 24-84143
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 3:17 AM CST
Conflict Check Party
Cenlar Capital Corporation
Defendant
Zions Bancorporation, N.A.
Represented By
Brandon S. Stein
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Sabrina Anne Neff
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cenlar Federal Savings Bank
Represented By
Brandon S. Stein
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Sabrina Anne Neff
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebecca C Cason
Represented By
Matias Jose Adrogue
Matias J. Adrogue, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Leila Mariam El-Hakam
Matias J. Adrogue PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John F Thrash
Represented By
Matias Jose Adrogue
Matias J. Adrogue, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Leila Mariam El-Hakam
Matias J. Adrogue PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/14/2025 5:37 PM CDT
Thursday, December 12, 2024
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2024-84143 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-32626799) filed by Zions Bancorporation, N.A., Cenlar FSB. (Neff, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 3 27 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 5 4 pgs Exhibit D