California Southern District Court
Judge:Thomas J Whelan
Referred: Jill L Burkhardt
Case #: 3:24-cv-02312
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bw Diversity -Breach of Warranty
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 27, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02023-00053858-CU-BC-CTL
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 1:07 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Amy Maclear
Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Brady O'Bryan
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
contact info
Naoki S. Kaneko
Shook Hardy And Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Manteca Ford-Mercury, Inc.
Represented By
James M. McDermed
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Manjit Bajwa
Represented By
Gregory Sogoyan
Quill & Arrow, LLP
contact info
Camran Kyle Pakbaz
Apex Consumer Law Group, PC
contact info
Allen Amarkarian
Apex Consumer Law Group, PC
contact info
Kevin Y. Jacobson
Quill & Arrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PS Bajwa Inc.
Represented By
Gregory Sogoyan
Quill & Arrow, LLP
contact info
Camran Kyle Pakbaz
Apex Consumer Law Group, PC
contact info
Allen Amarkarian
Apex Consumer Law Group, PC
contact info
Kevin Y. Jacobson
Quill & Arrow LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 03/27 3:17 PM
ORDER Granting12 Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/26/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
12 12 motion Dismiss Wed 03/26 1:14 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by Manjit Bajwa. (Jacobson, Kevin) (exs)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
11 11 order Minute Order (No Time) ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/07 5:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: A further telephonic, counsel-only Settlement Disposition Conference is hereby SET for 3/28/2025 , at 1:45 PM before Judge Burkhardt. For purposes of the conference, all participating counsel shall call the Court's teleconference line at (619) 657-0677 and use conference identification number 359-794-697. If a joint motion for dismissal and proposed order for dismissal are received on or before 3/26/2025 , then the Settlement Disposition Conference shall be vacated. (fxb2)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Settlement Disposition Conference ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 03/07 5:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Settlement Disposition Conference held on 3/7/2025. Minute Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Matthew Treybig). (Defendant Attorney Brady O'Bryan). (no document attached) (fxb2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
9 9 order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 03/06 2:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: The parties'8 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline to File Dismissal is DENIED. Accordingly, a telephonic, counsel-only Settlement Disposition Conference (SDC) will be held on 3/7/2025, at 3:15 PM as previously set in the Court's7 Minute Order. (no document attached) (fxb2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
8 8 motion Continue Wed 03/05 3:59 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline to File Dismissal by Manjit Bajwa, PS Bajwa Inc.. (Jacobson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/17 12:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER: On January 16, 2025, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement. (ECF No. 6.) Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conferences previously scheduled for January 24, 2025 (ECF No. 5) are VACATED. 2. A Joint Motion for Dismissal shall be electronically filed on or before March 5, 2025.1 On the same day the Joint Motion for Dismissal is filed, the proposed order for dismissal, for the signature of the Honorable Thomas J. Whelan, shall be e-mailed to the chambers of the Honorable Thomas J.Whelan. 3. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and proposed order for dismissal are not submitted on or before March 5, 2025, then a telephonic, counsel-only Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held on March 7, 2025, at 3:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. For purposes of theConference, all participating counsel shall call the Courts teleconference lineat (619) 657-0677 and use conference identification number 437-456-743.4. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and proposed order for dismissal are receivedon or before March 5, 2025, then the Settlement Disposition Conference shallbe vacated. ( Motion to Dismiss Deadline 3/5/2025., Settlement Disposition Conference set for 3/7/2025 03:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt.)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 01/16 3:40 PM
Joint Notice of Settlement (Jacobson, Kevin) (exs)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
5 5 13 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Fri 12/13 11:30 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference: Video Conference of Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/24/2025 at 9:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Video Conference of Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2025 at 9:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Joint Discovery Plan due 1/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 12/13/24.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Thu 12/12 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ford Motor Company. Identifying Corporate Parent State Street Corporation, Corporate Parent Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Corporate Parent State Street Bank and Trust Company, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. and certain affiliates for Ford Motor Company. (anh)
Related: [-]
3 3 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 12/12 2:33 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Manteca Ford-Mercury, Inc.. (anh)
Related: [-]
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 12/12 2:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (anh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 12/12 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19427233.), filed by Ford Motor Company. The new case number is 3:24-cv-2312-W-JLB. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Ford's Answer,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Manteca Ford- Mercury Inc.'s Answer,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Request for Dismissal