Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Carla Baldwin
Case #: 3:24-cv-00573
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 1:47 AM PST
Defendant
Peppermill Casinos, Inc.
Plaintiff
Raquel Constantino
PO Box 6494
Reno, NV 89513
Represented By
Ronald J. Dreher
Dreher Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
18 18 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Mon 04/07 11:32 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 4/7/2025 before Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. Crtrm Administrator: AB ; Pla Counsel: Ronald Dreher with Raquel Constantino ; Def Counsel: Patrick Hicks with Denise Vessie, Michelle Manning, and Danie Rose ; Court Reporter: Liberty ; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m. ; Recording start and end times: 9:04:09 a.m. - 11:28:53 a.m. ; Courtroom: 2 . After private discussions and negotiations, the parties were unable to reach a settlement agreement. This case will move forward on the normal litigation track. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
17 17 minord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/31 3:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 3/31/2025. By Deputy Clerk: AB. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Status Report (ECF No. 16 ) and it does not appear that the Status Conference concerning the Early Neutral Evaluation is necessary. As such, the telephonic Status Conference scheduled for Friday, April 4, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. (ECF No. 11) is hereby vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 03/31 5:37 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Early Neutral Evaluation Status Report by Plaintiff Raquel Constantino. (Dreher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
15 15 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 02/27 10:16 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER adopting13 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/6/2025. Motions due by 9/5/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2025. NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has parties not receiving electronic service.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/27/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Thu 02/27 10:10 AM
ORDER - The Court has reviewed the joint case management report, (ECF No.12 ), and it does not appear that an initial case management conference is necessary. If the parties disagree, they may file a stipulation requesting a case management conference. In the event a discovery dispute arises, the parties shall follow the informal discovery dispute procedure outlined in the Court's standing order. (ECF No.8 .) IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/27/2025. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
13 13 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 02/26 3:34 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Peppermill Casinos, Inc.. (Dissinger, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Case Management Report Wed 02/26 3:32 PM
Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendant Peppermill Casinos, Inc.. (Dissinger, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
11 11 minord Minute Order Setting Hearing Mon 02/10 2:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 2/10/2025. By Deputy Clerk: AB. A telephonic Status Conference concerning the Early Neutral Evaluation (ECF No. 10 ) is set for Friday, April 4, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. Counsel shall dial 1-855-244-8681 , and enter the meeting number (access code) 2318 801 2454 , approximately ten (10) minutes prior to the hearing. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the following matters: (1) Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1); (2) The parties who will attend the ENE; and (3) Any pending motions or other matters which may affect the ENE. The Status Conference will be vacated if the parties file a joint Early Neutral Evaluation Status Report no later than 12:00 p.m. on Monday, March 31, 2025, which certifies that the parties have made initial disclosures pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1), and that the plaintiff(s) have provided a computation of damages to defendant(s) pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1)(A)(iii). IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
Related: [-]
10 10 6 pgs order Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session Mon 02/10 1:37 PM
ORDER SETTING EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION SESSION - An in-person Early Neutral Evaluation Session is scheduled to commence on MONDAY, APRIL 7, 2025, at 9:00 a.m., before the Honorable Craig S. Denney, in Reno Courtroom 2, Bruce R. Thompson U.S. Courthouse and Federal Building, 400 South Virginia Street, Reno, Nevada. The written evaluation statements shall be received by the Clerk's Office, Suite 301, not later than 4:00 p.m., MONDAY, MARCH 31, 2025. The ENE written evaluation statement should be delivered to the Clerk's Office in an envelope clearly marked Confidential, contains ENE Evaluation Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 2/10/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
9 9 4 pgs order Order Fri 02/07 1:41 PM
ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall file a joint case management report by no later than Monday, March 24, 2025 . IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on February 7, 2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KM)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Standing Order Fri 02/07 1:37 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER - MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARLA BALDWIN. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KM)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 02/07 12:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Peppermill Casinos, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hicks, Patrick)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/07 12:16 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Peppermill Casinos, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/17/2025. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/24/2025.(Dissinger, Michael)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 18, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 01/18 11:20 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raquel Constantino re1 Complaint,,. (Dreher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 12/13 8:57 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peppermill Casinos, Inc.. (DLS)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice ENE Notice Fri 12/13 8:46 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney will be the evaluating judge in this case. No ENE will be conducted in cases subject to arbitration. Parties to cases subject to mandatory arbitration, as well as parties who agree to arbitrate, must notify the Court of the same no later than 14 days after the date of this Notice. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (no image attached) (DLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 12/12 5:40 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Raquel Constantino. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dreher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/12 5:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Peppermill Casinos, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7896907) by Raquel Constantino. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/22/2024. Proof of service due by 3/12/2025. (Dreher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 12/13 8:44 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DLS)
Related: [-]