Maryland District Court
Judge:Paula Xinis
Case #: 1:24-cv-03585
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
10 10 misc Mail Returned Mon 05/05 11:19 AM
Mail Sent to Leyleen Lilith Aquino Returned as Undeliverable. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Page of Returned Document ECF no.
Att: 8
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Mon 04/07 11:56 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement as to Leyleen Lilith Aquino.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
8 8 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/26 1:55 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot Plaintiff's5 Motion to Proceed with Preliminary Injunction without Prepayment of Security; denying Plaintiff's7 Motion for Injunctive Relief; granting Plaintiff time to file a supplemental complaint as set forth; denying without prejudice Plaintiff's3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; setting deadline for Finance Officer to file an inmate account summary information sheet as set forth. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/26/2025. (c/m to Plaintiff with blank civil rights complaint form as directed and c/m to Finance Officer 3/26/25) (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/11 12:56 PM
MOTION to Order the Defendants to Submit Case Management Plan by Leyleen Lilith Aquino (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Envelope
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 misc New Case Notification Letter Thu 12/12 2:18 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Leyleen Lilith Aquino. (c/m P 12/12/24- ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 12/12 2:15 PM
MOTION Proceed with Preliminary Injunction without prepayment of Security by Leyleen Lilith Aquino.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 12/12 2:03 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Leyleen Lilith Aquino.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 12/12 1:59 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Leyleen Lilith Aquino.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 12/12 1:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leyleen Lilith Aquino(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Inmate Account Summary,
Att: 2 Authorization to Release Institutional Account Information and to Pay Filing Fee
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/12 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against T. Adams, William Bailey, Batilla, Brown, Centurion, Christopher, Clayton, Collins, Cottman, DOC Central Office, Donaway, Floyd, Foxwell, Gallagher, Harris, Anne Harvey, Houtson, Kestler, Evan Lane, J.M. Lewis, Jessica N. Lewis, Marcola, Matthews, Mercer, Mitchell, J. Philip Morgan, Ness, Daniel Price, Pumell, School Principal, Carolyn J. Scraggs, Stigill, Toussant, S. Waters, Winder, YesCare, filed by Leyleen Lilith Aquino.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29,
Att: 30 Exhibit 30,
Att: 31 Exhibit 31,
Att: 32 Exhibit 32,
Att: 33 Exhibit 33,
Att: 34 Exhibit 34,
Att: 35 Exhibit 36,
Att: 36 Exhibit 37,
Att: 37 Summons,
Att: 38 USM Forms,
Att: 39 Envelope