Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00925
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 13, 2024 1:29 AM CST
Defendant
Eleazar Eloy Lara (1)
Represented By
Pia R Lederman - FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
John J Stickney-FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Jorge Agustin Martinez (2)
Represented By
J Warren St John
Law Office Of J Warren St John
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael James Ferry-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/13/2024 2:26 AM CST
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
Arrest of Eleazar Eloy Lara, Jorge Agustin Martinez (mcrd)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Eleazar Eloy Lara (1), Jorge Agustin Martinez (2). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) (mcrd).
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Eleazar Eloy Lara. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 12/10/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney J Warren St John for Jorge Agustin Martinez appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 12/10/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
5 5 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Eleazar Eloy Lara (mcrd)
Related: [-]
6 6 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jorge Agustin Martinez (mcrd)
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Eleazar Eloy Lara, Jorge Agustin Martinez: This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel are present. By this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligations of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. Failure to do so may result in consequences such as the dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 12/10/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION to Continue, MOTION for Pretrial Detention () filed by USA as to Eleazar Eloy Lara, Jorge Agustin Martinez (mcrd)
Related: [-]
9 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Eleazar Eloy Lara. Defendant is ordered detained pending a Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 12/12/2024 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 12/10/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
10 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Jorge Agustin Martinez. Defendant is ordered detained pending a Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 12/16/2024 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 12/10/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]